EP1652530 - DRUG PROMOTING CERAMIDE TRANSPORT, BASE SEQUENCE FOR PRODUCING THE DRUG, METHOD OF MEASURING ACTIVITY OF PROMOTING CERAMIDE RELEASE AND METHOD OF MEASURING ACTIVITY OF PROMOTING INTERMEMBRANE CERAMIDE TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | For all designated states JAPAN as represented by DIRECTOR GENERAL OF NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES 23-1, Toyama-cho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-0052 / JP | [2006/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANADA, Kentaro 2-8-1-202, Kajigaya, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2130015 / JP | 02 /
NISHIJIMA, Masahiro A-101, 1-4-29, Miyamaedaira, Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2160006 / JP | 03 /
KUMAGAI, Keigo 1-33-28-101, Yanaka Adachi-ku, Tokyo 1020006 / JP | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Herzog, Martin, et al KNH Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartGmbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | Herzog, Martin, et al Kahlhöfer . Neumann . Herzog . Fiesser, Karlstrasse 76 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 04724124.5 | 29.03.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004JP04455 | Priority number, date | JP20030274232 | 14.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003274232 | [2006/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005004898 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1652530 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, A61K47/24, A61P35/00, A61P37/04, A61P31/00, A61P43/00, C12N15/12, C07K14/47 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2006/42] |
Former [2006/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTEL ZUR FÖRDERUNG DES CERAMID-TRANSPORTS, BASISSEQUENZ ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES ARZNEIMITTELS, VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER AKTIVITÄT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER CERAMID-FREISETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER AKTIVITÄT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DES CERAMID-INTERMEMBRANTRANSFERS | [2006/18] | English: | DRUG PROMOTING CERAMIDE TRANSPORT, BASE SEQUENCE FOR PRODUCING THE DRUG, METHOD OF MEASURING ACTIVITY OF PROMOTING CERAMIDE RELEASE AND METHOD OF MEASURING ACTIVITY OF PROMOTING INTERMEMBRANE CERAMIDE TRANSFER | [2006/18] | French: | MEDICAMENTS FAVORISANT LE TRANSPORT DE CERAMIDES, SEQUENCE DE BASE DE PRODUCTION DE CE MEDICAMENT, TECHNIQUE DE MESURE D'ACTIVITE FAVORISANT LA LIBERATION DE CERAMIDES ET TECHNIQUE DE MESURES D'ACTIVITE FAVORISANT LE TRANSFERT DE CERAMIDES INTERMEMBRANAIRE | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2006 | Translation filed | 20.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 21.09.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0050607 (SAUS JUAN [ES]); | [X] - RAYA A. ET AL, "Characterization of a novel type of serine/thereonine kinase that specifically phosphorylates the human goodpasture antigen", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 274, no. 18, pages 12642 - 12649, XP002145905 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.18.12642 | [X] - RAYA A ET AL, "Goodpasture antigen-binding protein, the kinase that phosphorylates the goodpasture antigen, is an alternatively spliced variant implicated in autoimmune pathogenesis", THE JOURNAL BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. 275, no. 51, pages 40392 - 40399, XP002240530 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M002769200 |