EP1610944 - REINFORCEMENT STRUCTURES AND PROCESSES FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Owens-Corning Fiberglas Espana, S.A. Km 20, Carretera C-1411 09205 San Vicent de Castellet / ES | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADOLPHS, Georg Narcis Giralt C/. Puigcerta 45 E08201 Sabadell / ES | [2007/20] |
Former [2006/01] | 01 /
ADOLPS, Georg Narcis Giralt 16-E E-08292 Sabadell / ES | Representative(s) | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al R G C Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04724296.1 | 30.03.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004EP03653 | Priority number, date | US20030404199 | 31.03.2003 Original published format: US 404199 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004087410 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1610944 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/16, B32B5/26 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B5/06 (US);
B32B5/16 (EP,US);
B32B2038/008 (US);
B32B2250/20 (US);
B32B2260/021 (US);
B32B2305/026 (US);
B32B2305/08 (US);
B32B2305/20 (US);
Y10T428/18 (EP,US);
Y10T428/183 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24033 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24124 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249928 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKUNGSSTRUKTUREN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2006/01] | English: | REINFORCEMENT STRUCTURES AND PROCESSES FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2006/01] | French: | STRUCTURES DE RENFORT ET LEURS PROCEDES DE FABRICATION | [2006/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0283195 (WIGGINS TEAPE GROUP LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-23 * claims 1-5,15 ** page 3, line 41 - line 45 *; | [Y]EP0534041 (ALBANY INT CORP [US]) [Y] 1-23 * claims 1-11 * * page 2, column 2, line 52 - page 3, column 3, line 18 * * page 4, column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 51 *; | [Y]EP1010793 (LANTOR BV [NL]) [Y] 1-23 * claims 1,3,4,6-12,18 * * page 3, column 4, line 35 - page 4, column 5, line 33 * |