Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7273127 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2007 | B2 | US2006106516 | 18.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB01356 | 31.03.2004 | GB0308133 | 09.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1610999 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2009 | B1 | EP1610999 | 04.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB01356 | 31.03.2004 | GB0308133 | 09.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE429373T | 15.05.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB01356 | 31.03.2004 | GB0308133 | 09.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004020750D1 | 04.06.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB01356 | 31.03.2004 | GB0308133 | 09.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004089725 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0308133 | 09.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2400358 | 13.10.2004 | A | GB0308133D0 | 14.05.2003 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0308133 | 09.04.2003 |