EP1611514 - PROGRAM-CONTROLLED UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2010/22] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖNING, Werner Prinzenstr. 31 80639 München / DE | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Jannig, Peter, et al Jannig & Repkow Patentanwälte PartG mbB Klausenberg 20 86199 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Jannig, Peter, et al Jannig & Repkow, Patentanwälte, Klausenberg 20 86199 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04724979.2 | 01.04.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004DE00706 | Priority number, date | DE20031015637 | 04.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10315637 | [2006/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004090731 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1611514 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/14 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
G06F12/1483 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROGRAMMGESTEUERTE EINHEIT | [2006/01] | English: | PROGRAM-CONTROLLED UNIT | [2006/01] | French: | UNITE COMMANDEE PAR PROGRAMME | [2006/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 07.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1132801 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * figure 1 * * figure 3 * * column 2, line 44 - line 54 * * column 3, line 2 - line 42 * * column 4, line 15 - line 56 * * column 8, line 24 - column 9, line 28 *; | [Y]US5987557 (EBRAHIM ZAHIR [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 1, line 24 - line 26 * * column 3, line 1 - line 9 * * column 4, line 57 - line 67 * * column 6, line 17 - line 21 * * column 7, line 12 - line 16 * * column 9, line 20 - line 22 * * column 11, line 20 - line 29 * * column 12, line 30 - line 55 *; | [A]FR2726381 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 9,10 * abstract * |