EP1615496 - CROP SPRAYING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knight, Brian George Wireless Hill South Luffenham Oakham Rutland LE15 8NF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states Knight, Brian George Wireless Hill South Luffenham Oakham Rutland LE15 8NF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Martin, Philip John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Gwilt, Julia Louise Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | ||
Former [2006/03] | Gwilt, Julia Louise Maguire Boss 5 Crown Street GB-St. Ives, Cambridge PE27 5EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 04725413.1 | 02.04.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004GB01460 | Priority number, date | GB20030008507 | 12.04.2003 Original published format: GB 0308507 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004089077 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1615496 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1615496 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01M7/00 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
A01M7/0075 (EP);
A01M7/0078 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE FELDSPRITZE | [2006/03] | English: | CROP SPRAYING APPARATUS | [2006/03] | French: | PULVERISATEUR DE RECOLTE | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 03.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2009
21.08.2009
ADMISSIBLE Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2009
21.08.2009
ADMISSIBLE Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2009
21.08.2009
ADMISSIBLE Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE Opponent's representative Schuster, Thomas Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2009
Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | 27.08.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.11.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.12.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.12.2011 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 21.06.2016 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2016/44] | Appeal following opposition | 24.02.2012 | Appeal received No. T0550/12 | 04.04.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.06.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 21.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.07.2016 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.09.2008 | BE | 24.09.2008 | CY | 24.09.2008 | CZ | 24.09.2008 | EE | 24.09.2008 | FI | 24.09.2008 | IT | 24.09.2008 | NL | 24.09.2008 | PL | 24.09.2008 | RO | 24.09.2008 | SI | 24.09.2008 | SK | 24.09.2008 | TR | 24.09.2008 | BG | 24.12.2008 | SE | 24.12.2008 | GR | 25.12.2008 | ES | 04.01.2009 | PT | 24.02.2009 | HU | 25.03.2009 | IE | 02.04.2009 | LU | 02.04.2009 | CH | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | DK | 30.04.2016 | FR | 02.05.2016 | [2017/38] |
Former [2017/10] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CY | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
TR | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
GR | 25.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
HU | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 02.04.2009 | ||
LU | 02.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CY | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
TR | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
GR | 25.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
HU | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 02.04.2009 | ||
LU | 02.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
GR | 25.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
HU | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 02.04.2009 | ||
LU | 02.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
GR | 25.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
IE | 02.04.2009 | ||
LU | 02.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
GR | 25.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
IE | 02.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
IE | 02.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
IE | 02.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
IT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
ES | 04.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
BE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2038153 (DORMAN SPRAYER CO LTD) [Y] 2,3 * column 3, line 12 - line 21; figure 7 *; | [XY]US5927606 (PATTERSON ROGER L [CA]) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 49 - line 63 * * column 5, line 17 - line 49 * * column 7, line 36 - column 8, line 45 * * column 9, line 1 - line 10; figures 1-10 * [Y] 2,3; | [A]US6053419 (KROHN MARTIN L [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 6, line 41 - line 55 ** column 9, line 8 - line 11; figures 1,10 * |