EP1635396 - LAMINATED SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMCO Corporation 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8634 / JP | For all designated states Industry University Cooperation Foundation Hanyang University 17 Haengdang-dong Seongdong-gu Seoul 133-791 / KR | [2013/37] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states Sumco Corporation 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8634 / JP | ||
For all designated states Industry University Cooperation Foundation Hanyang University 17 Haengdang-dong Sungdong-gu Seoul 133-791 / KR | |||
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states Sumco Corporation 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8634 / JP | ||
For all designated states Hanyang Hak Won Co., Ltd. 17, Hangdang-1-Dong, Sungdong-ku Seoul 133-070 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMIYAMA, Eiji, Sumitomo Mitsubishi Silicon Corp. 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8634 / JP | 02 /
KATOH, Takeo, Sumitomo Mitsubishi Silicon Corp. 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8634 / JP | 03 /
PARK, Jea Gun, Hanyang Hak Won Co., Ltd. 17, Haengdang 1-dong Seongdong-gu, Seoul / KR | [2013/37] |
Former [2006/11] | 01 /
KAMIYAMA, Eiji, Sumitomo Mitsubishi Silicon Corp. 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8634 / JP | ||
02 /
KATOH, Takeo, Sumitomo Mitsubishi Silicon Corp. 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8634 / JP | |||
03 /
PARK, Jea Gun, Hanyang Hak Won Co., Ltd. 17, Haengdang 1-dong Seongdong-gu, Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Hössle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | [2013/37] |
Former [2006/11] | Hössle Kudlek & Partner Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04725535.1 | 02.04.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004JP04886 | Priority number, date | JP20030099541 | 02.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003099541 | [2006/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004090986 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1635396 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1635396 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/762, H01L21/306 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
H01L21/30608 (EP,US);
H01L21/20 (KR);
H01L21/76254 (EP,US);
H01L27/12 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2006/11] | H01L27/12, H01L21/02 | Designated contracting states | DE [2006/28] |
Former [2006/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LAMINIERTES HALBLEITERSUBSTRAT UND PROZESS ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2006/11] | English: | LAMINATED SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2006/11] | French: | SUBSTRAT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR STRATIFIE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIE | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2005 | Translation filed | 28.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 11.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5882987 (SRIKRISHNAN KRIS V [US]) [X] 1-7,14-16 * column 4, line 7 - column 6, line 55; figure 6 * [A] 8-13; | [X]EP0905767 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [X] 1 * column 7, paragraph 41 - column 8, paragraph 46; figure 1; example 1 *; | [XA]EP1045448 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 5, paragraph 30 - column 11, paragraph 71 * [A] 3-16; | [A]EP1085562 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1-16* column 10, paragraph 50 - column 11, paragraph 53; figure 4 *; | [X]US6323108 (KUB FRANCIS J [US], et al) [X] 1-7,14-16 * column 8, line 39 - column 9, line 44; figure 1 * | International search | [X]JPH11121377 (IBM); | [X]JPH11102848 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK); | [Y]JP2000124092 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK, et al); | [Y]JP2003017723 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK); | [XP]JP2004080035 (PARK JEA-GUN, et al) | by applicant | US5374564 | US6020252 | JP2000124092 | US5882987 | US6323108 | - IEICE TRANS, ELECTRON, (1997), vol. E80C, no. 3, page 358 |