EP1626817 - TWO-DIMENSIONAL (2D) ARRAY CAPABLE OF HARMONIC GENERATION FOR ULTRASOUND IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIELE, Karl P.O. Box 3001 Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | Landousy, Christian Philips IP&S France Société Civile SPID 33 rue de Verdun BP 313 92156 Suresnes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | Landousy, Christian Société Civile SPID, 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04725753.0 | 05.04.2004 | [2006/08] | WO2004IB01116 | Priority number, date | US20030463096P | 15.04.2003 Original published format: US 463096 P | [2006/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004091812 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1626817 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/02, B06B1/06 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
B06B1/0276 (EP,US);
B06B1/0622 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZWEIDIMENSIONALE MATRIX FÜR DIE ERZEUGUNG VON HARMONISCHEN IN DER ULTRASCHALLBILDERERZEUGUNG | [2006/08] | English: | TWO-DIMENSIONAL (2D) ARRAY CAPABLE OF HARMONIC GENERATION FOR ULTRASOUND IMAGING | [2006/08] | French: | MATRICE 2D POUVANT CREER UNE HARMONIQUE A DES FINS D'IMAGERIE ULTRASONIQUE | [2006/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 20.12.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0641606 (ACUSON [US]); | [DA]US2001043090 (SAVORD BERNARD J [US]); | [A]US2002108220 (HANAFY AMIN M [US]); | [X]US6461299 (HOSSACK JOHN A [US]) |