EP1616330 - ALLOCATION CLASS SELECTION FOR FILE STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FONTIJN, Wilhelmus, F., J. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04725775.3 | 05.04.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004IB50392 | Priority number, date | EP20030101007 | 14.04.2003 Original published format: EP 03101007 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004090888 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1616330 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/12, G11B27/32 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G11B20/12 (KR);
G11B27/32 (KR);
G11B7/0045 (KR);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUTEILUNGSKLASSENAUSWAHL FÜR DIE DATEISPEICHERUNG | [2006/03] | English: | ALLOCATION CLASS SELECTION FOR FILE STORAGE | [2006/03] | French: | CHOIX DE CLASSES D'AFFECTATION POUR LE STOCKAGE DE FICHIERS | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 05.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/02] | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH09319625 ; | [A]WO02069339 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,10; | EP1369869 [ ] (SONY CORP [JP]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0122] * * paragraph [0145] * * paragraph [0200] - paragraph [0203] * * paragraph [0241] - paragraph [0242] * * paragraph [0275] - paragraph [0288] * * figures 18,19,30,43,52,53 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, & JP09319625 A 19971212 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,10 * abstract * |