EP1613607 - BENZENESULPHONAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS HERBICIDES OR DESICCANT/DEFOLIANT COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMPRECHT, Gerhard Rote-Turm-Str. 28 69469 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
PUHL, Michael Bürstädter Str. 95 68623 Lampertheim / DE | 03 /
REINHARD, Robert Wieland-Str. 30 67065 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
SEITZ, Werner Bismarckstrasse 22b 68723 Plankstadt / DE | 05 /
ZAGAR, Cyrill Untere Clignetstr. 8 68167 Mannheim / DE | 06 /
WITSCHEL, Matthias Höhenweg 12b 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | 07 /
LANDES, Andreas Grünewaldstr. 15 67354 Römerberg-Heiligenstein / DE | [2006/02] | Application number, filing date | 04725933.8 | 06.04.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004EP03624 | Priority number, date | DE2003116311 | 08.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10316311 | [2006/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004089914 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1613607 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1613607 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/54, C07D521/00, C07D403/12, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, A01N43/54 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
C07D239/54 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N43/54 (EP,US);
A01N43/56 (EP,US);
A01N43/58 (EP,US);
A01N43/64 (EP,US);
A01N43/653 (EP,US);
A01N43/707 (EP,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,US);
A01N47/24 (EP,US);
A01N47/34 (EP,US);
A01N47/36 (EP,US);
A01N47/38 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Title | German: | BENZOLSULFONAMID-DERIVATE ALS HERBIZIDE ODER DESIKKANTE/DEFOLIANTE VERBINDUNGEN | [2006/02] | English: | BENZENESULPHONAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS HERBICIDES OR DESICCANT/DEFOLIANT COMPOUNDS | [2006/02] | French: | DERIVES DE BENZOLSULFONAMIDE CONSTITUANT DES COMPOSES HERBICIDES OU DESSICCANTS/DEFOLIANTS | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 26.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.04.2004 | CY | 09.01.2013 | CZ | 09.01.2013 | DK | 09.01.2013 | EE | 09.01.2013 | FI | 09.01.2013 | IT | 09.01.2013 | MC | 09.01.2013 | NL | 09.01.2013 | PL | 09.01.2013 | RO | 09.01.2013 | SE | 09.01.2013 | SI | 09.01.2013 | SK | 09.01.2013 | TR | 09.01.2013 | AT | 06.04.2013 | IE | 06.04.2013 | LU | 06.04.2013 | BG | 09.04.2013 | GB | 09.04.2013 | GR | 10.04.2013 | ES | 20.04.2013 | BE | 30.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | PT | 09.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
TR | 09.01.2013 | ||
AT | 06.04.2013 | ||
IE | 06.04.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GB | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
AT | 06.04.2013 | ||
IE | 06.04.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GB | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 06.04.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GB | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GB | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 09.01.2013 | |
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 09.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4369058 (LEVITT GEORGE) [A] 1-15,8 * claim - ** column 10 *; | [X]EP0361114 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * claim - * * page 13 *; | [XD]US5169430 (STRUNK RICHARD J [US], et al) [XD] 1-15 * abstract * * claim - * * column 25 - column 26; table I *; | [X]WO9700246 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * claim - * * page 93 *; | [DX]WO9742176 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [DX] 1-15 * abstract * * example - * * claim - *; | JP2002365759 [ ] (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X] - YOSHIOKA, YASUHIRO, "Heat-developable photographic films containing specific hydrazine and specific heterocyclic compound", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2002:959013, URL: STN, XP002289556 [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - SHREEKRISHNA G M ET AL, "Anthranilamides as intermediates for 3-substituted quinazoline-2,4-diones", CAOLD, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. CA62:4028g, XP002289557 [X] 1-10 * column A * |