EP1618040 - METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC PACKING OF CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISA AUTOMATION INDUSTRIELLE SA 61 Route de Savoie 1896 Vouvry / CH | [2006/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOIGTMANN, Jean-Pierre Rue de la Poste 16 1920 Martigny / CH | [2010/35] |
Former [2006/04] | 01 /
VOIGTMANN, Jean-Pierre Rue de la Poste 16 CH-1920 Martigny / CH | Representative(s) | Keilitz, Wolfgang, et al Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Nigerstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Keilitz, Wolfgang, et al Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Nigerstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/43] | Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Nigerstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/52] | Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Innere Wiener Strasse 8 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/46] | Keilitz, Wolfgang, et al Patentanwalt Zelletin & Partner Innere Wiener Strasse 8 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/04] | Zellentin, Rüdiger Zellentin & Partner, Zweibrückenstrasse 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04725939.5 | 06.04.2004 | [2006/04] | WO2004EP03649 | Priority number, date | DE20031016853 | 11.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10316853 | [2006/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004089754 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1618040 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65B19/34, B65B35/38, B65B35/50, B65B43/42 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
B65B35/50 (EP,KR,US);
B65B19/34 (EP,KR,US);
B65B19/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN ABPACKEN VON BEHÄLTERN | [2006/04] | English: | METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC PACKING OF CONTAINERS | [2006/04] | French: | PROCEDE POUR L'EMBALLAGE AUTOMATIQUE DE CONTENANTS | [2006/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 08.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/23] | 20.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]NL298268 (INTERNATIONAL MACHINERY) [Y] 11,12 * page 6, line 9 - line 18; figure - *; | [Y]DE1970461U (SANDOZ AG [DE]) [Y] 8 * figure 2 *; | [XY]GB1350112 (HEBERLEIN & CO AG) [X] 1,2,6,10 * page 2, line 11 - line 85; figure - * [Y] 3-5,8,9,11,12; | [Y]GB2003824 (LESIEUR COTELLE) [Y] 3-5 * page 3, line 14 - line 90; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]DE2825800 (ALUSUISSE) [Y] 11,12 * page 2, line 4 - line 10 *; | [A]US4586315 (WOLF WOLFRAM [DE]) [A] 11,12* figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5732536 (LIN CHING-LIN [TW], et al) [Y] 9 * figures 4,5,9 *; | [X]EP1123867 (TEXA AG [CH]) [X] 1,7 * column 3, line 37 - column 6, line 32; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US2825193 | GB1350112 | DE2643089 | WO9115349 | EP1114784 |