EP1616344 - CREATION OF A PERMANENT STRUCTURE WITH HIGH THREE-DIMENSIONAL RESOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELL, Stefan Burgstrasse 10 37073 Göttingen / DE | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04726458.5 | 08.04.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004EP03768 | Priority number, date | DE2003117613 | 13.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10317613 | US20030420896 | 22.04.2003 Original published format: US 420896 | DE2003125459 | 05.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10325459 | [2006/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004090950 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1616344 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1616344 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/0065 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
G11B7/00455 (EP);
G03F7/70408 (EP);
G11B7/244 (EP);
G11B2007/24624 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/03] | H01L21/027 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÄUMLICH HOCHAUFGELÖSTES ERZEUGEN EINER DAUERHAFTEN STRUKTUR | [2006/03] | English: | CREATION OF A PERMANENT STRUCTURE WITH HIGH THREE-DIMENSIONAL RESOLUTION | [2006/03] | French: | PRODUCTION HAUTE RESOLUTION SPATIALE D'UNE STRUCTURE DURABLE | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 02.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.08.2008 | CZ | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | EE | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | IT | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | PL | 13.08.2008 | RO | 13.08.2008 | SI | 13.08.2008 | SK | 13.08.2008 | TR | 13.08.2008 | BG | 13.11.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | ES | 24.11.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | HU | 14.02.2009 | LU | 08.04.2009 | BE | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
HU | 14.02.2009 | ||
LU | 08.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
LU | 08.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 13.08.2008 | |
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 13.08.2008 | |
ES | 24.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4104070 (MORITZ HOLGER ET AL) [X] 1,3-8,22,23 * column 1, lines 4-58 * * column 2, line 16 - column 4, line 12 *; | [X]US3712813 (KIEMLE H ET AL) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 11 * * column 3, line 70 - column 4, line 36; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5403435 (CATHEY DAVID A ET AL) [X] 1 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 2 * |