EP1615770 - BIAXIALLY ORIENTED POLYPROPYLENE FILM PROVIDED WITH A COLD-SEAL ADHESIVE COATING AND HAVING EXCELLENT LUBRICATING PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Treofan Germany GmbH & Co. KG Bergstrasse 66539 Neunkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states Treofan Germany GmbH & Co.KG Bergstrasse 66539 Neunkirchen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPEITH-HERFURTH, Angela Ernst-Ludwig-Strasse 12 63329 Egelsbach / DE | 02 /
HANSOHN, Robert Am Marktplatz 13 66459 Kirkel / DE | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Mai Besier European Trademark Attorneys Patentanwälte Kreuzberger Ring 18a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Mai, Dörr, Besier Patentanwälte Steuerberater/Wirtschaftsprüfer John-F.-Kennedy-Straße 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2011/33] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2006/03] | Kremer, Viola Treofan Germany GmbH & Co. KG Am Prime Parc 17 65479 Raunheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04726468.4 | 08.04.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004EP03751 | Priority number, date | DE20031016623 | 11.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10316623 | [2006/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004089621 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1615770 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1615770 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/18, B32B27/08 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/18 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B7/06 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
B32B2307/518 (US);
B32B2307/746 (US);
B32B2553/00 (US);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31667 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/03] | B32B27/08, B65B55/19 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Title | German: | BIAXIAL ORIENTIERTE POLYPROPYLENFOLIE MIT KALTSIEGELKLEBERBESCHICHTUNG UND GUTEN GLEITEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2006/03] | English: | BIAXIALLY ORIENTED POLYPROPYLENE FILM PROVIDED WITH A COLD-SEAL ADHESIVE COATING AND HAVING EXCELLENT LUBRICATING PROPERTIES | [2006/03] | French: | FEUILLE DE POLYPROPYLENE A ORIENTATION BIAXIALE POURVUE D'UN REVETEMENT ADHESIF POUR SOUDAGE PAR PRESSION A FROID ET POSSEDANT DE BONNES PROPRIETES DE GLISSEMENT | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 16.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2006 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Request for further processing for: | 04.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 04.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.09.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.04.2004 | CY | 14.11.2012 | CZ | 14.11.2012 | DK | 14.11.2012 | EE | 14.11.2012 | FI | 14.11.2012 | MC | 14.11.2012 | NL | 14.11.2012 | PL | 14.11.2012 | RO | 14.11.2012 | SE | 14.11.2012 | SI | 14.11.2012 | SK | 14.11.2012 | TR | 14.11.2012 | BG | 14.02.2013 | GR | 15.02.2013 | PT | 14.03.2013 | IE | 08.04.2013 | LU | 08.04.2013 | BE | 30.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 08.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 08.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 14.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3740366 (SANDERSON F, et al) [DA] 13,14 * figure 2 *; | [AY]EP0182463 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [A] 1,3-7 * column 3, lines 18-27 - column 4, lines 1-4,30-32; example 6; claims 1,6,7 * * column 5, lines 48-51 * [Y] 1,2,6,7,9-11,15,17; | [X]EP0645426 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-12,15,16 * page 4, lines 1-5,32-45-52 - page 5, lines 7,16,50; examples 1,5; claims 1,18-20,24 * * page 6, lines 8,25-28,49-51 - page 7, lines 1-3,19,20,50,51 * * page 8, lines 1,15,16 *; | [Y]US5681650 (PEIFFER HERBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 1 * examples 1,2,4,com.pex.3; claims 1,4-6,8,15,20 *; | [A]US5798174 (WILKIE ANDREW F [US])[A] 13,14; | [Y]WO0073064 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [Y] 1,2,6,7,9-11,15,17 * pages 4-7; claims 9,11,13 * |