EP1611404 - PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER AND FLOW GUIDE PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAHTERUS OY Pruukintie 7 23600 Kalanti / FI | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAUREN, Kari Urheilutie 1 A a 8 FI-23800 Laitila / FI | 02 /
SUOMINEN, Juha Kytämäenraitti 32 FI-23500 Uusikaupunki / FI | 03 /
KONTU, Mauri Vahteruksenraitti 22 FI-23600 Kalanti / FI | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Maskula, Silla Marjatta Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy P.O. Box 99 20521 Turku / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Maskula, Silla Marjatta Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy, P.O. Box 99 20521 Turku / FI | Application number, filing date | 04726530.1 | 08.04.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004FI00222 | Priority number, date | FI20030000527 | 08.04.2003 Original published format: FI 20030527 | [2006/01] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004090450 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1611404 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F28D9/00, F28F9/22 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
F28F9/22 (EP,KR,US);
F28D9/00 (KR);
F28D1/00 (KR);
F28D9/0006 (EP,US);
F28D9/005 (EP,US);
F28F3/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLATTENWÄRMETAUSCHER UND STRÖMUNGSFÜHRUNGSPLATTE | [2006/01] | English: | PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER AND FLOW GUIDE PLATE | [2006/01] | French: | ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR A PLAQUES ET PLAQUE DE GUIDAGE DU FLUX | [2006/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 11.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/03] | 26.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO03031896 (VAHTERUS OY [FI], et al); | [A]US2003000688 (MATHUR ACHINT P [US], et al); | [A]WO9745689 (NEK UMWELTTECHNIK AG [CH], et al); | [A]FR2816043 (BARRIQUAND ECHANGEURS [FR]); | [A]WO9109262 (KONTU MAURI [FI]); | [A]US2004031600 (KONTU MAURI [FI]); | [A]WO9930099 (VAHTERUS OY [FI], et al); | [A]US6158238 (LAMPINEN MARKKU [FI], et al) |