EP1620134 - MICROWAVE METHOD FOR PREPARING RADIOLABELLED GALLIUM COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VELIKYAN, Irina, Uppsala Imanet AB Uppsala University PET Centre 751 85 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
LANGSTROM, Bengt, Uppsala Imanet AB Uppsala University PET Centre 751 85 Uppsala / SE | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Hammett, Audrey Grace Campbell, et al GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Bucks. HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | Hammett, Audrey Grace Campbell, et al GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Bucks. HP7 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04726564.0 | 08.04.2004 | [2006/05] | WO2004GB01550 | Priority number, date | GB20030008408 | 11.04.2003 Original published format: GB 0308408 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004089425 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1620134 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1620134 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/00, A61K103/30 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
A61K51/088 (EP,US);
A61K51/00 (KR);
A61K51/0497 (EP,US);
A61K51/083 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/05] | A61K51/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROWELLENVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON RADIOMARKIERTEN GALLIUM KOMPLEXE | [2006/05] | English: | MICROWAVE METHOD FOR PREPARING RADIOLABELLED GALLIUM COMPLEXES | [2006/05] | French: | PROCEDE D'ACTIVATION MICRO-ONDE PERMETTANT DE PREPARER DES COMPLEXES DE GALLIUM RADIOMARQUES | [2006/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.07.2007 | BE | 04.07.2007 | CY | 04.07.2007 | CZ | 04.07.2007 | DK | 04.07.2007 | EE | 04.07.2007 | RO | 04.07.2007 | SI | 04.07.2007 | SK | 04.07.2007 | TR | 04.07.2007 | BG | 04.10.2007 | GR | 05.10.2007 | PT | 04.12.2007 | [2010/38] |
Former [2009/35] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | SI | 04.07.2007 | |
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | SI | 04.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9533757 (MALLINCKRODT MEDICAL INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * examples 15-17; claims 1-3 *; | [YD]WO9956791 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [YD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - MORRISSEY ET AL, "Microwave preparation of technetium-99m-sulfur colloid", JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE TECHNOLOGY, SOCIETY OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199209), vol. 20, no. 3, ISSN 0091-4916, pages 159 - 162, XP002105674 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - MCCARTHY T J ET AL, "APPLICATION OF MICROWAVE HEATING TO THE SYNTHESIS OF U18FFLUOROMISONIDAZOLE", APPLIED RADIATION AND ISOTOPES, PERGAMON PRESS LTD., EXETER, GB, (19930801), vol. 44, no. 8, ISSN 0969-8043, pages 1129 - 1132, XP000395096 [Y] 1-15 * page 1132, column L, lines 16-22 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0969-8043(93)90118-T | [DY] - STONE-ELANDER S ET AL, "Fast chemistry in microwave fields: Nucleophilic <18>F-radiofluorinations of aromatic molecules", APPLIED RADIATION AND ISOTOPES 1993 UNITED KINGDOM, (1993), vol. 44, no. 5, ISSN 0883-2889, pages 889 - 893, XP009034688 [DY] 1-15 * abstract * * page 892, column L, lines 20-42 * |