EP1732770 - WHEEL ARRANGEMENT AND WHEEL COVER ARRANGEMENT FOR SUCH A WHEEL ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Louvel, Philippe 71, Avenue Edouard Herriot 92350 Le Plessis Robinson / FR | [2006/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/51] | Application number, filing date | 04726591.3 | 08.04.2004 | [2006/51] | WO2004IB01503 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005097519 | Date: | 20.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1732770 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1732770 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60B7/20 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
B60B7/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/29] |
Former [2006/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RADANORDNUNG UND RADKAPPENANORDNUNG FÜR SOLCH EINE RADANORDNUNG | [2006/51] | English: | WHEEL ARRANGEMENT AND WHEEL COVER ARRANGEMENT FOR SUCH A WHEEL ARRANGEMENT | [2006/51] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE ROUE ET AGENCEMENT D'ENJOLIVEUR DE ROUE ASSOCIE | [2006/51] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 24.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.10.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.01.2008 | [2009/41] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE403614 (JOSEPH PAUL TALLUAU; JOSEPH DENOILE) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US3155430 (SCHINDLER JOHN C) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]FR562943 (JOSEPH-PAUL TALLUAU) [A] 1,9 * the whole document * |