EP1625329 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR A FUME EXTRACTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2006/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROY, Reinhold Am Hag 6 88299 Leutkirch / DE | [2006/07] | Application number, filing date | 04726990.7 | 13.04.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004EP03885 | Priority number, date | DE2003116571 | 10.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10316571 | [2006/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004090426 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1625329 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1625329 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/20 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
F24C15/2021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FüR EINE DUNSTSABZUGSVORRICHTUNG | [2006/07] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE FOR A FUME EXTRACTION DEVICE | [2006/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR SYSTEME D'EVACUATION DE VAPEURS | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 22.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.06.2009 | CZ | 17.06.2009 | DK | 17.06.2009 | EE | 17.06.2009 | FI | 17.06.2009 | IE | 17.06.2009 | IT | 17.06.2009 | PL | 17.06.2009 | RO | 17.06.2009 | SI | 17.06.2009 | SK | 17.06.2009 | TR | 17.06.2009 | BG | 17.09.2009 | GR | 18.09.2009 | ES | 28.09.2009 | PT | 17.10.2009 | HU | 18.12.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
IT | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
HU | 18.12.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
IT | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CZ | 17.06.2009 | |
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
IT | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CZ | 17.06.2009 | |
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CZ | 17.06.2009 | |
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CZ | 17.06.2009 | |
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 17.06.2009 | |
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 17.06.2009 | |
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | FI | 17.06.2009 | |
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | FI | 17.06.2009 | |
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | FI | 17.06.2009 | |
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | FI | 17.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4552059 (POTTER GARY J [US]) [A] 1,2 * columns 3-7; figure 2 *; | [A]DE9101095U (INVENT GMBH) [A] 1,2,10-12,15 * pages 4-5 *; | [A]WO9313881 (FUTURUM AB [SE]) [A] * pages 1-4; figure - *; | [A]DE10028333 (BAUER ARMIN [DE], et al) [A] * column 1, line 12 - line 26 *; | [PA]EP1333231 (DIEHL AKO STIFTUNG GMBH & CO [DE]) [PA] * abstract *; | [PXA]EP1382914 (ALBATROS APPLIED TECHNOLOGIES [DE]) [PX] 1-3,10-12 * the whole document * [PA] 4-9,13-15 |