EP1610745 - TAMPON, IN PARTICULAR FOR FEMININE HYGIENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson GmbH Kaiserswerther Strasse 270 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRÄMER, Robert Am Schildchen 25 51109 Köln / DE | [2006/06] |
Former [2006/01] | 01 /
KRÄMER, Robert Archimedesstr. 36 51065 Köln / DE | Representative(s) | Metten, Karl-Heinz, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Metten, Karl-Heinz, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/01] | Groening, Hans Wilhelm BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04726992.3 | 13.04.2004 | [2006/01] | WO2004EP03871 | Priority number, date | DE2003116234 | 09.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10316234 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004089264 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1610745 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1610745 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/20, A61F13/34 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
A61F13/2051 (EP,US);
A61F13/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/29] |
Former [2006/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TAMPON, INSBESONDERE FÜR FRAUEN | [2006/01] | English: | TAMPON, IN PARTICULAR FOR FEMININE HYGIENE | [2006/01] | French: | TAMPON, EN PARTICULIER POUR L'HYGIENE FEMININE | [2006/01] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 18.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3863636 (JOHNSON CARL W) [A] 2-9* column 2, line 47 - line 56; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US4328804 (SHIMATANI KAZUO) [X] 1-12 * column 3, lines 1-4; figure -; claims 1,3 * |