EP1617596 - RADIO TERMINAL, BASE DEVICE, WIRELESS SYSTEM, RADIO TERMINAL CONTROL PROGRAM, BASE DEVICE CONTROL PROGRAM, AND COMPUTER-READABLE RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAMOTO, Kenji 7-28-8 Asumigaoka Midori-Ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba 267-0066 / JP | [2006/04] |
Former [2006/03] | 01 /
SAKAMOTO, Kenji / JP | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/03] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04727143.2 | 13.04.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004JP05271 | Priority number, date | JP20030112770 | 17.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003112770 | JP20040114698 | 08.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004114698 | [2006/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004093389 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1617596 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/167, H04N5/44 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
H04N7/1675 (EP,US);
H04N21/436 (KR);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04L12/2854 (EP,US);
H04N21/4108 (EP,US);
H04N21/42684 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
H04N21/43637 (EP,US);
H04N21/4882 (EP,US);
H04N5/44 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/03] | H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/30] |
Former [2006/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKENDGERÄT, BASISEINRICHTUNG, DRAHTLOSES SYSTEM, FUNKENDGERÄTESTEUERPROGRAMM, BASISEINRICHTUNGSSTEUERPROGRAMM UND COMPUTERLESBARES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2006/03] | English: | RADIO TERMINAL, BASE DEVICE, WIRELESS SYSTEM, RADIO TERMINAL CONTROL PROGRAM, BASE DEVICE CONTROL PROGRAM, AND COMPUTER-READABLE RECORDING MEDIUM | [2006/03] | French: | TERMINAL RADIO, DISPOSITIF DE BASE, SYSTEME SANS FIL, PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE DU TERMINAL RADIO, PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE DU DISPOSITIF DE BASE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2005 | Translation filed | 10.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 10.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/34] | 18.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0961193 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [A]WO0180547 (MOBILIAN ISRAEL LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [YA]US2002016776 (CHU CHORNG-YEONG [US], et al) [Y] 1,11 * column W * [A] 2-10,12-22; | [YA]GB2377574 (SMITH GRAEME ROY [GB]) [Y] 1,11 * the whole document * [A] 2-10,12-22 | International search | [Y]JP2001144767 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0477817 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH05235845 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2002150339 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2002051051 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2002063652 (TOSHIBA CORP) | Examination | - WOODINGS R W ET AL, "Rapid heterogeneous ad hoc connection establishment: accelerating bluetooth inquiry using irda", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 2002. WCNC2002. 200 2 IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020317), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-7376-1, pages 342 - 349, XP010585789 | - CHAUDHRY M A R ET AL, "Protocols stack and connection establishment in bluetooth radio", STUDENTS CONFERENCE, 2002. ISCON '02. PROCEEDINGS. IEEE AUG. 16-17, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020816), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-7505-5, pages 48 - 55, XP010647264 |