EP1614195 - CONTACTING DEVICE FOR A PLUG-IN CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERDING, Markus Imandtstr. 65 45279 Essen / DE | [2006/02] | Application number, filing date | 04727241.4 | 14.04.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004EP03917 | Priority number, date | DE2003117588 | 16.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10317588 | [2006/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004093262 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1614195 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1614195 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/18, H01R29/00, H01R13/115, H01R13/66 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
H01R12/721 (EP);
H01R12/71 (KR);
H01R13/66 (KR);
H01R13/6658 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2006/06] |
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTAKTIERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE STECKVORRICHTUNG | [2006/02] | English: | CONTACTING DEVICE FOR A PLUG-IN CONNECTOR | [2006/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTACT POUR DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 19.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE19923676 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * column 2, line 2 - column 3, line 16; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5195897 (KENT HAROLD B [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,10,11 * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 5; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US6508664 (PHALEN MICHAEL DENNIS [US]) [Y] 4-9 * column 2, line 52 - column 5, line 42; figures 1,5 * |