EP1613619 - QUINAZOLINE DERIVATIVES FOR TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERON, Nicola, Murdoch, AstraZeneca R & D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 02 /
PASQUET, Georges, Rene, AstraZeneca R & D Reims Z.I. la pompelle, BP 1050 Cedex 2, F-51689 Reims / FR | 03 /
MORTLOCK, Andrew, Austen, AstraZeneca R&D Alderley Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | 04 /
JUNG, Frederic, Henri, AstraZeneca R & D Reims Z.I. la pompelle, BP 1050 Cedex 2, F-51689 Reims / FR | [2006/02] | Application number, filing date | 04727325.5 | 14.04.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004GB01614 | Priority number, date | EP20030290951 | 16.04.2003 Original published format: EP 03290951 | [2006/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004094410 | Date: | 04.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1613619 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1613619 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, A61K31/517, A61P35/00 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | QUINAZOLIN-DERIVATE FÜR DIE BEHANDLING VON KREBS | [2006/02] | English: | QUINAZOLINE DERIVATIVES FOR TREATMENT OF CANCER | [2006/02] | French: | DERIVES DE QUINAZOLINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 22.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.2008 | BE | 26.03.2008 | CY | 26.03.2008 | CZ | 26.03.2008 | DK | 26.03.2008 | EE | 26.03.2008 | FI | 26.03.2008 | NL | 26.03.2008 | PL | 26.03.2008 | RO | 26.03.2008 | SI | 26.03.2008 | SK | 26.03.2008 | TR | 26.03.2008 | IE | 14.04.2008 | LU | 14.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | BG | 26.06.2008 | GR | 27.06.2008 | PT | 01.09.2008 | HU | 27.09.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
TR | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 14.04.2008 | ||
LU | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
HU | 27.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 14.04.2008 | ||
LU | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
HU | 27.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 14.04.2008 | ||
LU | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
IE | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
PL | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9515758 (RHONE POULENC RORER PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * page 1 - page 3; example -; claim - *; | [DY]WO0121597 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [DY] 1-25 * page 1 - page 3; example -; claim - *; | [DY]WO0200649 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [DY] 1-25 * page 1 - page 3; example -; claim - *; | [PY]WO03055491 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [PY] 1-25 * page 1 - page 3; claim -; table - *; | [E]WO2004058781 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [E] 1-25 * page 1 - page 3; example -; claim -; table - *; | [E]WO2004058752 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [E] 1-25* page 1 - page 3; example -; claim - *; | [A] - H. KATAYAMA ET. AL., "The Aurora Kinases. Role in cell transformation and Tumorigenesis.", CANCER AND METASTASIS REVIEWS, (2003), vol. 22, pages 451 - 64, XP009022607 [A] 1-25 * page 453, column 2 - page 461, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1023789416385 | [A] - D. MAHADEVAN ET. AL., "Structure basede design of novel anti-cancer agents targetting aurora kinases", CURRENT MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, ANTI CANCER AGENTS, (2003), vol. 3, pages 25 - 34, XP009022702 [A] 1-25 * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1568011033353524 |