EP1614145 - SILICON SUBSTRATE COMPRISING POSITIVE ETCHING PROFILES WITH A DEFINED SLOPE ANGLE, AND PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität Dresden Dezernat 5, SG 5.1, Mommsenstrasse 11 01069 Dresden / DE | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHTER, Karola Gamigstrasse 7 01239 Dresden / DE | 02 /
FISCHER, Daniel Hüblerstrasse 17 01209 Dresden / DE | [2007/03] |
Former [2006/02] | 01 /
RICHTER, Karola Gamigstrasse 7 01239 Dresden / DE | ||
02 /
FISCHER, Daniel Deubener Strasse 19 01159 Dresden / DE | Representative(s) | Hempel, Hartmut Patentanwaltskanzlei Jagdweg 10 01159 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Hempel, Hartmut Patentanwaltskanzlei, Jagdweg 10 01159 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 04727512.8 | 15.04.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004DE00804 | Priority number, date | DE2003118568 | 15.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10318568 | [2006/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004093162 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1614145 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
H01L21/30655 (EP,US);
B81C1/00103 (EP,US);
B81C1/00571 (EP,US);
H01L21/3065 (EP,US);
B81B2203/033 (EP,US);
B81B2203/0384 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SILIZIUMSUBSTRAT MIT POSITIVEN TZPROFILEN MIT DEFINIERTEM B SCHUNGSWINKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2006/02] | English: | SILICON SUBSTRATE COMPRISING POSITIVE ETCHING PROFILES WITH A DEFINED SLOPE ANGLE, AND PRODUCTION METHOD | [2006/02] | French: | SUBSTRAT DE SILICIUM A PROFILS D'ATTAQUE POSITIFS, AYANT UN ANGLE D'INCLINAISON DETERMINE, ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 16.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/17] | 07.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.07.2006 | 30.04.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE4241045 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1-4 * column 1, line 1 - line 50 * * column 3, line 32 - line 46 * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 30 ** column 5, line 39 - line 57 *; | [A]EP0822582 (SURFACE TECH SYS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 3 - line 9 * * page 2, line 23 - line 26 * * page 4, line 3 - line 42 * * page 5, line 51 - page 6, line 16 * * page 6, line 35 - line 42 * * page 7, line 48 - line 51; figures 14,18,19a,19b; claims 1,10-12 *; | [YA]DE19736370 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 4,6-8 * column 1, line 5 - line 45 * * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 1 * * column 3, line 30 - line 38 * * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 50 * [A] 1-4; | [XA]US6180466 (IBOK EFFIONG E [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 5 - line 24 * * column 4, line 27 - line 39 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 40; figures 1E,1F * [A] 2; | [XA]US6198150 (GELZINIS PETER VICTOR [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 19 - line 35 * * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 12; figures 2A-2C * * column 4, line 25 - line 35 * * column 4, line 52 - line 65 * [A] 2-4; | [XY] - VOLLAND B ET AL, "Dry etching with gas chopping without rippled sidewalls", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY B: MICROELECTRONICS PROCESSING AND PHENOMENA, AMERICAN VACUUM SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199911), vol. 17, no. 6, ISSN 0734-211X, pages 2768 - 2771, XP012007814 [X] 1-3 * page 2768, column L * * page 2769, column L, paragraph II * * page 2769, column R, paragraph IV; figure 1 * [Y] 4,6-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.591061 |