EP1615694 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INFLUENCING MAGNETIC PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/24] |
Former [2013/39] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2006/03] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLEICH, Bernhard, @c/o Philips IP & Standards GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 02 /
WEIZENECKER, Jürgen, @Philips IP & Standards GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2017/24] |
Former [2006/03] | 01 /
GLEICH, Bernhard, c/o Philips IP & Standards GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | ||
02 /
WEIZENECKER, Jürgen, Philips IP & Standards GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/24] |
Former [2013/46] | Verweij, Petronella Danielle, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/03] | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04727658.9 | 15.04.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004IB50442 | Priority number, date | EP20030101014 | 15.04.2003 Original published format: EP 03101014 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004091721 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1615694 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1615694 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61N2/02, A61N2/06, A61N1/40, // A61B5/05 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
A61N2/06 (EP,US);
A61N1/406 (EP,US);
A61N2/02 (EP,US);
A61B5/0515 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/03] | A61N2/02, A61N1/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2006/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR BEEINFLUSSUNG MAGNETISCHER PARTIKEL | [2006/03] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INFLUENCING MAGNETIC PARTICLES | [2006/03] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'AGIR SUR DES PARTICULES MAGNETIQUES | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 25.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.04.2004 | AT | 14.06.2017 | CY | 14.06.2017 | CZ | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | ES | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | IT | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | NL | 14.06.2017 | PL | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | SI | 14.06.2017 | SK | 14.06.2017 | TR | 14.06.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 15.04.2004 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0399789 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 6-8,10-14 * abstract * * column 4, lines 4-15,42-58 * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 40 *; | [X]US6404202 (DAMADIAN TIMOTHY [US], et al) [X] 6,10,11 * abstract * * column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 23 *; | [X]WO0117611 (EUROP I OF SCIENCE AB [SE], et al) [X] 6,9,10,12 * abstract * * page 2, lines 2-25 * * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 15 *; | [X]WO03022360 (TRITON BIOSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 6,10,11 * abstract * * page 8, line 19 - page 10, line 10 *; | [X]US5794622 (CHOPP MICHEAL [US], et al) [X] 6,13,14 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 31 * * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 27 * | Examination | US6470220 | US6462544 | by applicant | EP0399789 | US6404202 | WO0117611 | WO03022360 | US5794622 |