EP1623055 - ALUMINIUM-WETTABLE CARBON-BASED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLTECH Invent S.A. 6, rue Adolphe Fisher 1520 Luxembourg / LU | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN, Thinh, T. Route du Grand-Lancy 165b CH-1213 ONEX / CH | 02 /
DE NORA, Vittorio Sandrigham House NASSAU / BS | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Cronin, Brian Harold John, et al CRONIN Intellectual Property Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [2008/32] |
Former [2006/06] | Cronin, Brian Harold John c/o Moltech S.A., Quai du Mont-Blanc 21 1201 Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 04727661.3 | 15.04.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004IB50457 | Priority number, date | WO2003IB01472 | 17.04.2003 Original published format: PCT/IB0301/472 | WO2003IB04043 | 09.09.2003 Original published format: PCT/IB0304/043 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004092449 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1623055 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C25C3/08 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
C25C3/125 (EP,US);
C04B35/52 (EP,US);
C04B35/522 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/52 (EP,US);
C04B41/90 (EP,US);
C25C3/08 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00879 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3262 (EP,US);
C04B2235/327 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3272 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3275 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3279 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3281 (EP,US);
C04B2235/402 (EP,US);
C04B2235/404 (EP,US);
C04B2235/422 (EP,US);
C04B2235/425 (EP,US);
C04B2235/48 (EP,US);
C04B2235/75 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/52 (US,EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/0072, C04B41/4535, C04B41/5009 (EP,US);
C04B41/52, C04B41/0072, C04B41/4535, C04B41/5072, C04B41/522 (US,EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4523, C04B41/5155 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALUMINIUMBENETZBARER KÖRPER AUF KOHLENSTOFFBASIS | [2006/06] | English: | ALUMINIUM-WETTABLE CARBON-BASED BODY | [2006/06] | French: | CORPS A BASE DE CARBONE APTE A ETRE MOUILLE PAR L'ALUMINIUM | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 01.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/18] | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4670407 (KIEHL JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 32 * claim 3 *; | [X]US4699763 (SINHAROY SEMAHAT D [US], et al) [X] 32 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO9817843 (MOLTECH INVENT SA [LU], et al) [X] 1-14,32-39 * claims 1-3,9-12,23-28 *; | [X]WO0142168 (MOLTECH INVENT SA [LU], et al) [X] 1-14,32-39 * page 4, line 7 - page 10, line 10 *; | [A]US6358393 (BERCLAZ GEORGES [CH], et al) [A] 15-31* claims 1,8 * |