EP1645286 - DRUG FOR NERVE REGENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | [2006/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORISHITA, Tsuyoshi c/o BioFrontier Laboratories Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co.,Ltd. 3-6,Asahi-machi 3-chome Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-8533 / JP | 02 /
SAKURADA, Kazuhiro 9-16,Misuzugaoka, Aobaku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 225-0016 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Keiko BioFrontier Laboratories Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co,Ltd. 3-6,Asahi- machi 3-chome Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-8533 / JP | 04 /
IKEDA, Shun-ichi 1367-21, Minami-oya Machida-shi Tokyo 194-0031 / JP | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/15] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04728057.3 | 16.04.2004 | [2006/15] | WO2004JP05503 | Priority number, date | JP20030114579 | 18.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003114579 | [2006/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004091663 | Date: | 28.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1645286 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/00, A61K31/404, A61K31/4045, A61K31/407, A61K31/553, C07D403/04, C07D403/14, C07D498/22, A61P25/28, A61P25/08, A61P25/22, A61P25/18, A61P25/24, C07D487/14 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
A61K31/4045 (EP,US);
A61K31/407 (EP,US);
A61K31/553 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTEL ZUR NERVENREGENERATION | [2006/15] | English: | DRUG FOR NERVE REGENERATION | [2006/15] | French: | MEDICAMENT POUR LA REGENERATION DES NERFS | [2006/15] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2005 | Translation filed | 16.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 15.11.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH02306974 (GOEDECKE AG); | [X]JPH07508268 ; | [X]WO9942100 (SAGAMI CHEM RES [JP], et al); | [X]WO0038675 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al); | [X]WO0113916 (SAGAMI CHEM RES [JP], et al); | [X]WO0137819 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al); | [X]WO02062387 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al); | [X] - LEOST M. ET AL, "Paullones are potent inhibitors of glycogen synthase kinase-3beta and cyclin-dependent kinase 5/p25", EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (2000), vol. 267, pages 5983 - 5994, XP000981256 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1432-1327.2000.01673.x | [X] - CHEN G. ET AL, "Enhancement of Hippocampal Neurogenesis by Lithium", JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. 75, pages 1729 - 1734, XP002951304 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1471-4159.2000.0751729.x |