EP1626854 - INSTALLATION FOR REPROCESSING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coperion GmbH Theodorstrasse 10 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/01] |
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states Coperion Werner & Pfleiderer GmbH & Co. KG Theodorstrasse 10 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNZ, Rainer Eulenhöfle 5 71540 Murrhardt / DE | 02 /
STRECKER, Jürgen Banater Strasse 25 70825 Korntal / DE | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | Rau, Manfred, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | Rau, Manfred, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04728106.8 | 17.04.2004 | [2006/08] | WO2004EP04093 | Priority number, date | EP20030011995 | 28.05.2003 Original published format: EP 03011995 | [2006/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004106031 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1626854 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1626854 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/50, B29C47/08 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
B29B7/60 (EP,US);
B29B7/48 (EP,US);
B29B7/481 (US);
B29B7/487 (EP,US);
B29B7/488 (EP);
B29B7/7466 (EP,US);
B29C48/256 (EP,US);
B29C48/2562 (EP,US);
B29C48/266 (EP,US);
B29C48/38 (EP,US);
B29C48/385 (EP,US);
B29C48/40 (EP);
B29C48/405 (EP);
B29C48/57 (EP,US);
B29B7/82 (EP,US);
B29C48/03 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUM AUFBEREITEN VON STOFFEN | [2006/08] | English: | INSTALLATION FOR REPROCESSING MATERIALS | [2006/08] | French: | INSTALLATION SERVANT A TRAITER DES MATERIAUX | [2006/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.08.2010 | CZ | 11.08.2010 | DK | 11.08.2010 | EE | 11.08.2010 | FI | 11.08.2010 | HU | 11.08.2010 | IE | 11.08.2010 | IT | 11.08.2010 | NL | 11.08.2010 | PL | 11.08.2010 | RO | 11.08.2010 | SE | 11.08.2010 | SI | 11.08.2010 | SK | 11.08.2010 | TR | 11.08.2010 | BG | 11.11.2010 | GR | 12.11.2010 | ES | 22.11.2010 | PT | 13.12.2010 | AT | 17.04.2011 | GB | 17.04.2011 | LU | 17.04.2011 | BE | 30.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | FR | 02.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IT | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
TR | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
AT | 17.04.2011 | ||
GB | 17.04.2011 | ||
LU | 17.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IT | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
AT | 17.04.2011 | ||
GB | 17.04.2011 | ||
LU | 17.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IT | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
AT | 17.04.2011 | ||
GB | 17.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IT | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
GB | 17.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IT | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IT | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
FR | 02.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IT | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IT | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
IT | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
RO | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 11.08.2010 | |
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | FI | 11.08.2010 | |
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | FI | 11.08.2010 | |
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
PL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SI | 11.08.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | NL | 11.08.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07205147 ; | [YA]GB1183445 (UNIROYAL ENGLEBERT DEUTSCHLAND A.G.) [Y] 2,3,7,8 * figure - * [A] 9-12; | [XAY]GB1364725 (USM CORP) [X] 1,4 * page 4, line 29 - line 46 * * figure 2; claim 1 * [A] 5,6,9-16 [Y] 2,3,7,8; | [A]US5865472 (FREYNHOFER ALBRECHT [DE]) [A] 1-4* abstract *; | [A]EP1008434 (DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1,7-9 * column 3, line 51 - line 54 * * column 4, line 12 - line 26 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 4 * * figures 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07205147 A 19950808 (HITACHI ZOSEN SANGYO KK) [A] 1,13-15 * abstract * |