EP1667549 - CYLINDRICAL APPLICATOR FOR DISPENSING COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Doria, Antonio Silvio Sampaio Rua Filipe de Gusmao, No 61 05441-100 Sao Paulo -SP / BR | [2006/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2006/24] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04728307.2 | 20.04.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004BR00056 | Priority number, date | BR20030305111 | 23.09.2003 Original published format: BR 0305111 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005027683 | Date: | 31.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1667549 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/04 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
A45D34/041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZYLINDERAUFTRAGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN KOSMETIKPRODUKT | [2006/24] | English: | CYLINDRICAL APPLICATOR FOR DISPENSING COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS | [2006/24] | French: | APPLICATEUR CYLINDRIQUE POUR DISTRIBUER DES COMPOSITIONS COSMETIQUES | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 01.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 20.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0331843 (ANDRADE RUYMAR) [X] 12,13 * column 3, line 1 - line 11 * * column 6, line 23 - column 7, line 21; figures 4-6; claim - *; | [A]EP0499318 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1115861 (CLIFFORD BREWER BARCLAY) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2187950 (LOUIS MARCEL LTD) [A] 1-13 * page 2, line 38 - page 3, line 28; figure -; claim - *; | [A]JPH09254580 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09254580 A 19970930 (PILOT CORP:THE) [A] 1,12 * abstract * |