EP1615809 - A SAFETY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB Wallentinsvägen 22 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states AUTOLIV DEVELOPMENT AKTIEBOLAG 447 83 Vargarda / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGLUND, Lennart Korsnäbbsgatan 5 S-447 32 Vargarda / SE | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Parry, Simon James Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/03] | Parry, Simon James Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04728485.6 | 20.04.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004SE00599 | Priority number, date | GB20030009307 | 24.04.2003 Original published format: GB 0309307 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004094204 | Date: | 04.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1615809 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1615809 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/34 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
B60R21/38 (EP);
B60R21/34 (GB);
E05D3/022 (EP);
E05F1/10 (EP);
E05Y2900/536 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG | [2006/03] | English: | A SAFETY DEVICE | [2006/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 25.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2010 | BE | 17.03.2010 | CY | 17.03.2010 | CZ | 17.03.2010 | DK | 17.03.2010 | EE | 17.03.2010 | FI | 17.03.2010 | IT | 17.03.2010 | NL | 17.03.2010 | PL | 17.03.2010 | RO | 17.03.2010 | SE | 17.03.2010 | SI | 17.03.2010 | SK | 17.03.2010 | TR | 17.03.2010 | IE | 20.04.2010 | LU | 20.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | BG | 17.06.2010 | GB | 17.06.2010 | GR | 18.06.2010 | ES | 28.06.2010 | PT | 19.07.2010 | HU | 18.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 20.04.2010 | ||
LU | 20.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GB | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
HU | 18.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 20.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GB | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
HU | 18.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 20.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GB | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
IT | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 20.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 20.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 20.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
PT | 19.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
DK | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 20.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 17.06.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
BE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CY | 17.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.03.2010 | ||
EE | 17.03.2010 | ||
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
RO | 17.03.2010 | ||
SE | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
SK | 17.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.06.2010 | ||
ES | 28.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
NL | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 17.03.2010 | |
FI | 17.03.2010 | ||
PL | 17.03.2010 | ||
SI | 17.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | PL | 17.03.2010 | |
SI | 17.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE10116717 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [A]EP1293400 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP1295763 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [XP]FR2833222 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]); | [XP]WO03086826 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE], et al) |