EP1622739 - MACHINE AND PROCESS FOR CUTTING OPENINGS IN A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KBA-GIORI S.A. 4, rue de la Paix 1003 Lausanne / CH | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAEDE, Johannes Georg Max-Heim-Strasse 8 97074 Würzburg / DE | [2006/17] |
Former [2006/06] | 01 /
SCHAEDE, Johannes Georg Max-Heim-Strasse 8 97074 WURZBURG / DE | Representative(s) | Bugnion Genève Bugnion S.A. Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Route de Florissant 10 Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | Bugnion Genève Bugnion S.A. Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | Application number, filing date | 04728605.9 | 21.04.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004IB01273 | Priority number, date | EP20030009986 | 02.05.2003 Original published format: EP 03009986 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004096482 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1622739 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1622739 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/10, B23K26/38, B23K26/42, B42D15/10, B26D7/18, B65H29/02, B23K26/08, B23Q11/00 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
B23K26/10 (EP,US);
B23K26/38 (EP,US);
B23K26/702 (EP,US);
B26D7/18 (EP,US);
B26F1/38 (EP,US);
B42D25/00 (EP,US);
B42D25/29 (EP,US);
B65H29/044 (EP,US);
B65H35/0006 (EP,US);
B23K2101/18 (EP,US);
B65H2301/5152 (EP,US);
B65H2301/51536 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON ÖFFNUNGEN IN EIN SUBSTRAT | [2006/06] | English: | MACHINE AND PROCESS FOR CUTTING OPENINGS IN A SUBSTRATE | [2006/06] | French: | MACHINE ET PROCEDE POUR DECOUPER DES OUVERTURES DANS UN SUBSTRAT | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 17.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.08.2006 | CY | 02.08.2006 | CZ | 02.08.2006 | EE | 02.08.2006 | FI | 02.08.2006 | NL | 02.08.2006 | PL | 02.08.2006 | RO | 02.08.2006 | SI | 02.08.2006 | SK | 02.08.2006 | TR | 02.08.2006 | BG | 02.11.2006 | DK | 02.11.2006 | SE | 02.11.2006 | GR | 03.11.2006 | ES | 13.11.2006 | PT | 02.01.2007 | HU | 03.02.2007 | LU | 21.04.2007 | IE | 23.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | [2017/11] |
Former [2009/44] | BE | 02.08.2006 | |
CY | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
PL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
TR | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
HU | 03.02.2007 | ||
LU | 21.04.2007 | ||
IE | 23.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/41] | BE | 02.08.2006 | |
CY | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
PL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
HU | 03.02.2007 | ||
LU | 21.04.2007 | ||
IE | 23.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | BE | 02.08.2006 | |
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
PL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
IE | 23.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/41] | BE | 02.08.2006 | |
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
PL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
IE | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | BE | 02.08.2006 | |
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
PL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
IE | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | BE | 02.08.2006 | |
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
PL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
IE | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | BE | 02.08.2006 | |
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
PL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | BE | 02.08.2006 | |
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
PL | 02.08.2006 | ||
RO | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | BE | 02.08.2006 | |
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
PL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
PL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
PL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 02.08.2006 | |
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
PL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | FI | 02.08.2006 | |
PL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SI | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 02.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH07214359 ; | [Y]JPH0229476 ; | [XY]JPH10113787 ; | [Y]JPH07197374 ; | [Y]JPS62234688 ; | [X]FR2586959 (DAVID JACQUES [FR]) [X] 1,5,6 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE4131617 (MEINEN TOMAS [DE]) [Y] 12,13* the whole document *; | [Y]US5348285 (HUESER PETER [DE]) [Y] 4,8,12,13 * column 4, line 21 - column 5, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [YD]WO9510420 (KURZ LEONHARD FA [DE], et al) [YD] 7,14 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0927597 (RAINER SRL [IT]) [Y] 1,5,6,8,11-13 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [0016]; figure - *; | [XY]EP1184127 (LANGE CARL INGOLF [DE]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0017]; figure 1 * [Y] 4,8,12,13 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP7214359 A 19950815 (AMADA CO LTD) [X] 1,5,6,8,11 * abstract * [Y] 7,12-14 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP9029476 A 19970204 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 12,13 * abstract * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10113787 A 19980506 (AMADA CO LTD) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract * [Y] 2,8,9 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP7197374 A 19950801 (OFIC CO; others: 01) [Y] 2,8,9 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880406), vol. 0121, no. 05, Database accession no. (M - 681), & JP62234688 A 19871014 (YAMAZAKI MAZAK CORP) [Y] 1,5,6,11-13 * abstract * |