EP1622295 - METHOD FOR THE SPECTRAL CONFIGURATION OF SIGNALS MODULATED BY MEANS OF ORTHOGONAL FREQUENCY DIVISION MULTIPLEXING (OFDM) FOR AN ELECTRICAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diseño de Sistemas en Silicio S.A. Charles Robert Darwin, 2 Parque Tecnologico 46980 Paterna (Valencia) / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states Diseno de Sistemas en Silicio S.A. Charles Robert Darwin, 2, Parque Tecnologico 46980 Paterna (Valencia) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLASCO CLARET, Jorge Vicente Guardia Civil, 23 - 2o 38 E-46020 Valencia / ES | 02 /
RIVEIRO INSUA, Juan Carlos Beata Genoveva Torres, 30- Esc. B-10o-Pta. 43 E-46019 Valencia / ES | 03 /
IRANZO MOLINERO, Salvador Juan Llorens 29, Pta. 8 E-46008 Valencia / ES | 04 /
ABAD MOLINA, José Fray Rafael de Vélez, 6 - 2oI E-29700 Vélez / ES | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2006/05] | Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 04728821.2 | 22.04.2004 | [2006/05] | WO2004ES00173 | Priority number, date | ES20030001022 | 06.05.2003 Original published format: ES 200301022 | [2006/05] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004100412 | Date: | 18.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1622295 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 18.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00, H04B3/54 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
H04L27/2602 (EP,US);
H04L27/26025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SPEKTRALKONFIGURATION VON OFDM (ORTHOGONAL FREQUENCY DIVISION MULTIPLEXING) MODULIERTEN SIGNALEN FÜR EIN ELEKTRISCHES NETZWERK | [2006/05] | English: | METHOD FOR THE SPECTRAL CONFIGURATION OF SIGNALS MODULATED BY MEANS OF ORTHOGONAL FREQUENCY DIVISION MULTIPLEXING (OFDM) FOR AN ELECTRICAL NETWORK | [2006/05] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONFIGURABILITE SPECTRALE DE SIGNAUX MODULES PAR MULTIPLEXAGE DE DIVISION DE FREQUENCE ORTHOGONALE (OFDM) POUR RESEAU ELECTRIQUE | [2006/05] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2005 | Translation filed | 05.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: ES | 05.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 19.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/02] | 30.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2009 | 30.04.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5790516 (GUDMUNDSON PEROLS LEIF MIKAEL [SE], et al); | [Y]WO0237706 (ARYYA COMMUNICATIONS INC [US]); | [Y]US2002105901 (CHINI AHMAD [CA], et al); | [YP]US2003235147 (WALTON JAY R [US], et al) |