EP1622800 - BRAKING DEVICE FOR A WIND POWER PLANT COMPRISING A ROTOR, WHICH CONVERTS WIND ENERGY INTO ROTATIONAL MOTION, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A BRAKING DEVICE OF THIS TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Rexroth AG Heidehofstrasse 31 70184 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUMANN, Joachim Vorstadtstrasse 34 97816 Lohr / DE | 02 /
EIGENBROD, Karlheinz Rhönweg 19 97737 Gemünden / DE | 03 /
BEHRENS, Harald Gehrhof 8 31249 Hohenhameln / DE | [2006/06] | Application number, filing date | 04729357.6 | 24.04.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004EP04362 | Priority number, date | DE2003120580 | 07.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10320580 | [2006/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004098968 | Date: | 18.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1622800 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1622800 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/68, F03D7/02 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
F03D7/0248 (EP);
B60T13/686 (EP);
F05B2260/902 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREMSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE WINDENERGIEANLAGE MIT EINEM DIE WINDENERGIE IN EINE DREHBEWEGUNG UMSETZENDEN ROTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER DERARTIGEN BREMSEINRICHTUNG | [2006/06] | English: | BRAKING DEVICE FOR A WIND POWER PLANT COMPRISING A ROTOR, WHICH CONVERTS WIND ENERGY INTO ROTATIONAL MOTION, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A BRAKING DEVICE OF THIS TYPE | [2006/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FREINAGE POUR INSTALLATION ÉOLIENNE, COMPRENANT UN ROTOR CONVERTISSANT L'ÉNERGIE ÉOLIENNE EN MOUVEMENT ROTATIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'EXPLOITATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE FREINAGE DE CE TYPE | [2006/21] |
Former [2006/06] | DISPOSITIF DE FREINAGE POUR INSTALLATION EOLIENNE, COMPRENANT UN ROTOR CONVERTISSANT L'ENERGIE EOLIENNE EN MOUVEMENT ROTATIF ET PROCEDE D'EXPLOITATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE FREINAGE DE CE TYPE | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 28.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.10.2006 | CZ | 25.10.2006 | EE | 25.10.2006 | FI | 25.10.2006 | FR | 25.10.2006 | GB | 25.10.2006 | IE | 25.10.2006 | IT | 25.10.2006 | NL | 25.10.2006 | PL | 25.10.2006 | RO | 25.10.2006 | SI | 25.10.2006 | SK | 25.10.2006 | TR | 25.10.2006 | BG | 25.01.2007 | SE | 25.01.2007 | GR | 26.01.2007 | PT | 26.03.2007 | AT | 24.04.2007 | LU | 24.04.2007 | HU | 26.04.2007 | BE | 30.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 25.10.2006 | |
CZ | 25.10.2006 | ||
EE | 25.10.2006 | ||
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
FR | 25.10.2006 | ||
GB | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
PL | 25.10.2006 | ||
RO | 25.10.2006 | ||
SI | 25.10.2006 | ||
SK | 25.10.2006 | ||
BG | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
AT | 24.04.2007 | ||
LU | 24.04.2007 | ||
HU | 26.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | CZ | 25.10.2006 | |
EE | 25.10.2006 | ||
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
FR | 25.10.2006 | ||
GB | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
PL | 25.10.2006 | ||
RO | 25.10.2006 | ||
SI | 25.10.2006 | ||
SK | 25.10.2006 | ||
BG | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
AT | 24.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 25.10.2006 | |
EE | 25.10.2006 | ||
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
FR | 25.10.2006 | ||
GB | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
PL | 25.10.2006 | ||
RO | 25.10.2006 | ||
SI | 25.10.2006 | ||
SK | 25.10.2006 | ||
BG | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
AT | 24.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 25.10.2006 | |
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
FR | 25.10.2006 | ||
GB | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
PL | 25.10.2006 | ||
RO | 25.10.2006 | ||
SI | 25.10.2006 | ||
SK | 25.10.2006 | ||
BG | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
AT | 24.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 25.10.2006 | |
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
GB | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
PL | 25.10.2006 | ||
RO | 25.10.2006 | ||
SI | 25.10.2006 | ||
SK | 25.10.2006 | ||
BG | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
AT | 24.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
FR | 08.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 25.10.2006 | |
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
GB | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
PL | 25.10.2006 | ||
RO | 25.10.2006 | ||
SI | 25.10.2006 | ||
SK | 25.10.2006 | ||
BG | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
FR | 08.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 25.10.2006 | |
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
GB | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
PL | 25.10.2006 | ||
RO | 25.10.2006 | ||
SI | 25.10.2006 | ||
SK | 25.10.2006 | ||
BG | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 25.10.2006 | |
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
GB | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
PL | 25.10.2006 | ||
RO | 25.10.2006 | ||
SI | 25.10.2006 | ||
SK | 25.10.2006 | ||
BG | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | CZ | 25.10.2006 | |
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
PL | 25.10.2006 | ||
RO | 25.10.2006 | ||
SI | 25.10.2006 | ||
SK | 25.10.2006 | ||
BG | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 25.10.2006 | |
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
IE | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
PL | 25.10.2006 | ||
RO | 25.10.2006 | ||
BG | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
PL | 25.10.2006 | ||
BG | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 25.10.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2206930 (LAWSON TANCRED H SONS & CO SIR) [A] 1-18* abstract *; | [DA]US6254197 (LADING PER [DK], et al) [DA] 1-18 * column 2, lines 16-24; figure 4 *; | [A]WO03011666 (KELSEY HAYES CO [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * |