EP1703499 - PREPIT INFORMATION DETECTOR, OPTICAL INFORMATION RECORDER, PROGRAM AND COMPUTER-READABLE INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGIWARA, Kei c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-2-3 Shinyokohama, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8530 / JP | [2007/11] |
Former [2006/38] | 01 /
HAGIWARA, Kei 1682-6-202, Kawawacho, Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-0057 / JP | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04729545.6 | 26.04.2004 | [2006/38] | WO2004JP06023 | Priority number, date | JP20030406978 | 05.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003406978 | [2006/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005055211 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1703499 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/005, G11B20/10 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
G11B20/10009 (EP);
G11B20/10037 (EP);
G11B20/10314 (EP);
G11B7/0053 (EP);
G11B2020/1274 (EP);
G11B2220/2566 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/38] | G11B7/005 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2007/11] |
Former [2006/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PREPIT-INFORMATIONSDETEKTOR, OPTISCHER INFORMATIONSRECORDER, PROGRAMM UND COMPUTERLESBARES INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2006/38] | English: | PREPIT INFORMATION DETECTOR, OPTICAL INFORMATION RECORDER, PROGRAM AND COMPUTER-READABLE INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM | [2006/38] | French: | DETECTEUR D'INFORMATIONS PRE-DEPRESSION REGULIERE, ENREGISTREUR D'INFORMATIONS OPTIQUE, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS DE PROGRAMMES ET EXPLOITABLES PAR ORDINATEUR | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2006 | Translation filed | 19.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 28.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 24.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2002067676 (INOKUCHI CHIKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,21 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0062]; figure 1 * [A] 17; | [XA]EP1229533 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,21 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0051] * [A] 17; | [A]US6487149 (YOKOI KENYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,17,21 * the whole document ** figure 2 *; | [A]US2003081531 (MASHIMO AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,17,21 * paragraphs [0029] , [0054] - [0065] - [0088] , [0091]; figure 11 * | International search | [Y]JP2000113463 ; | [Y]JP2000149259 ; | [Y]JP2002093061 | Examination | JP2001134943 | US6891782 |