EP1617824 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING RIBAVIRIN AS ACTIVE SUBSTANCE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pliva Lachema A.S, v. likvidaci. Karasek 1 621 33 Brno / CZ | [2015/21] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states Pliva-Lachema A.S. Karásek 1 621 33 Brno / CZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANC, Ales Purkynova 19 612 00 Brno / CZ | 02 /
ZALUDEK, Borek Novomestska 19 621 00 Brno / CZ | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2006/39] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2006/38] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant The Anchorage 34 Bridge Street Reading RG1 2LU / GB | ||
Former [2006/04] | Hak, Roman Traplova - Hakr - Kubat, Pristavni 24 170 00 Praha 7 / CZ | Application number, filing date | 04729818.7 | 28.04.2004 | [2006/04] | WO2004CZ00023 | Priority number, date | CZ20030001202 | 29.04.2003 Original published format: CZ 20031202 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004096187 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1617824 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/48, A61P31/12, A61K31/7056 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
A61K31/7056 (EP);
A61K9/1652 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | 22.11.2005 | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RIBAVIRIN ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES AKTIVEN BESTANDTEILS | [2006/04] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION CONTAINING RIBAVIRIN AS ACTIVE SUBSTANCE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF | [2006/04] | French: | PREPARATION PHARMACEUTIQUE DONT LE PRINCIPE ACTIF EST LA RIBAVINE, ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2006/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 23.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/23] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 14.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 13.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 13.04.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 13.04.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 13.04.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 13.04.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 30.04.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.01.2010 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2013/44] | 13.04.2015 | Resumption of proceedings | [2015/16] | 01.01.2010 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2015/16] | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO2004026261 (THREE RIVERS PHARMACEUTICALS L [US], et al) [PX] 1-8 * page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 17, paragraph 4 - page 18, paragraph 2; table 4 *; | [PX]WO03039517 (GENEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-8 * claim - *; | [X]WO02074317 (THREE RIVERS PHARMACEUTICALS L [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 3, line 19 - line 27; tables 2-4 *; | [X]WO0162229 (ADVANCED PHARMA INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * examples 127,128,157,158,167,168 * |