EP1617976 - ROBOT ARM WITH A WRIST HOUSING COMPRISING A THROUGH DUCT AND A MOTOR SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/04] | AN INDUSTRIAL ROBOT | ||
[2007/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB AB Kopparbergsvägen 2 721 83 Västerås / SE | [2008/04] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states ABB AB Kopparbergsvägen 2 721 83 Västeras / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSLUND, Karl-Erik DECEASED / SE | 02 /
KULLBORG, Ove Fimbulvägen 10 S-722 31 Västeras / SE | [2006/04] | Application number, filing date | 04730396.1 | 29.04.2004 | [2006/04] | WO2004SE00665 | Priority number, date | SE20030001274 | 29.04.2003 Original published format: SE 0301274 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004096503 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1617976 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1617976 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B25J17/02, B25J19/00 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
B25J17/0283 (EP,US);
B25J19/0029 (EP,US);
B25J9/102 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20311 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20317 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20323 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20335 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROBOTERARM MIT EINEM EINEN DURCHGANG UND EINEN MOTORRAUM AUFWEISENDEN HANDGELENKGEHÄUSE | [2007/41] | English: | ROBOT ARM WITH A WRIST HOUSING COMPRISING A THROUGH DUCT AND A MOTOR SPACE | [2007/41] | French: | BRAS DE ROBOT AVEC UN BOÎTIER DE POIGNET COMPRENANT UN PASSAGE ET UN ESPACE POUR MOTEUR | [2007/41] |
Former [2006/04] | INDUSTRIEROBOTER | ||
Former [2006/04] | AN INDUSTRIAL ROBOT | ||
Former [2006/04] | ROBOT INDUSTRIEL | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 06.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 27.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.01.2008 | BE | 23.01.2008 | CH | 23.01.2008 | CY | 23.01.2008 | CZ | 23.01.2008 | DK | 23.01.2008 | EE | 23.01.2008 | FI | 23.01.2008 | LI | 23.01.2008 | NL | 23.01.2008 | PL | 23.01.2008 | RO | 23.01.2008 | SI | 23.01.2008 | SK | 23.01.2008 | TR | 23.01.2008 | BG | 23.04.2008 | SE | 23.04.2008 | GB | 29.04.2008 | IE | 29.04.2008 | LU | 29.04.2008 | GR | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | ES | 04.05.2008 | PT | 23.06.2008 | HU | 24.07.2008 | [2011/38] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
TR | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
GB | 29.04.2008 | ||
IE | 29.04.2008 | ||
LU | 29.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
HU | 24.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
GB | 29.04.2008 | ||
IE | 29.04.2008 | ||
LU | 29.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
HU | 24.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
GB | 29.04.2008 | ||
IE | 29.04.2008 | ||
LU | 29.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
GB | 29.04.2008 | ||
IE | 29.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
GB | 29.04.2008 | ||
IE | 29.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 29.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CH | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 23.01.2008 | |
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4804304 (TELLDEN LEIF [SE]); | [Y]EP0648583 (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]); | [Y]EP0873826 (COMAU SPA [IT]); | [XP]EP1352720 (FANUC LTD [JP]) |