|
11.02.2011 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2010 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.02.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.02.2010 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.02.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.02.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2007 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2006 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2005 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.12.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Fax request to enter the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.09.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
10.02.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
10.02.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
10.02.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
10.02.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.01.2005 |
Notification of defects in the demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.12.2004 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
03.12.2004 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.12.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
02.12.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
02.12.2004 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.12.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
01.12.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
15 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |