EP1622751 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marshall, Adrian Richard 13 Longwall Haddenham Aylesbury Buckinghamshire HP17 8DL / GB | [2012/25] |
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states Marshall, Adrian Richard 13 Longwall, Haddenham, Aylesbury Buckinghamshire HP17 8DL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul Nicholas, et al Atkinson & Company Intellectual Property Limited 7 Moorgate Road Rotherham South Yorkshire S60 2EN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Chapman, Paul Nicholas, et al Atkinson & Company Intellectual Property Limited 7 Moorgate Road Rotherham South Yorkshire S60 2EN / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Chapman, Paul Nicholas, et al Atkinson Burrington Limited 28 President Buildings President Way Sheffield S4 7UR / GB | ||
Former [2006/06] | Chapman, Paul Nicholas, et al 28 President Buildings President Way Sheffield S4 7UR / GB | Application number, filing date | 04730589.1 | 30.04.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004GB01882 | Priority number, date | GB20030009888 | 30.04.2003 Original published format: GB 0309888 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004095938 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1622751 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1622751 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/30, B29C33/38, G06F17/50, // (A23G3/02, B29C43:36, 47:32) | [2012/25] | CPC: |
G16Z99/00 (EP,US);
A23G1/20 (EP,US);
A23G3/0236 (EP,US);
A23G3/0247 (EP,US);
B29C43/46 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B33Y50/00 (EP,US);
B29C2043/043 (EP,US);
B29C2043/466 (EP,US);
B29C2043/467 (EP,US);
B29C33/3835 (EP,US);
B29C48/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/06] | B29C33/30, B29C33/38, G06F17/50, // A23G3/02, B29C43/36, B29C47/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Title | German: | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DREIDIMENSIONALEN GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2006/06] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS | [2006/06] | French: | APPAREIL ET METHODE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'OBJETS TRIDIMENSIONNELS | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 25.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 27.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 27.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 27.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.05.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2004 | AT | 20.06.2012 | BE | 20.06.2012 | CY | 20.06.2012 | CZ | 20.06.2012 | DK | 20.06.2012 | EE | 20.06.2012 | FI | 20.06.2012 | MC | 20.06.2012 | NL | 20.06.2012 | PL | 20.06.2012 | RO | 20.06.2012 | SE | 20.06.2012 | SI | 20.06.2012 | SK | 20.06.2012 | TR | 20.06.2012 | BG | 20.09.2012 | GR | 21.09.2012 | ES | 01.10.2012 | PT | 22.10.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
SE | 20.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [AY]JP2001101246 ; | [A]JP2002086453 ; | [X]GB650067 (ROSE BROTHERS LTD) [X] 1 * page 3, line 4 - line 31 *; | [X]GB1319240 (ROSE FORGROVE LTD) [X] 1 * page 2, line 7 - line 55; figure - *; | [A]GB2122131 (NAGEMA VEB K) [A] 1-7 * page 1, line 83 - page 2, line 105; figure - *; | [X]US5733587 (REAM RONALD L [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 13; figures 3-5 *; | [A]EP0899080 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 7-12 * column 7, line 45 - column 8, line 18; figure 3 *; | [Y]US6021270 (HANAKI YASUHITO [JP], et al) [Y] 18-21* column 12, line 34 - line 40; figure - *; | [A]EP1216806 (MANUEL MARK [US], et al) [A] 13-21 * column 5, line 51 - column 7, line 42; figure - * | [AY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010803), vol. 2000, no. 21, & JP2001101246 A 20010413 (CANON INC) [A] 13-17 * abstract * [Y] 18-21 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020703), vol. 2002, no. 07, & JP2002086453 A 20020326 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV LAB INC) [A] 13-17 * abstract * |