EP1622479 - RING OF VARIABLE CONFIGURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mabina S.r.l. 11, Via Paolo da Cannobio 20122 Milano / IT | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASCHIO, Dario 15, Via Dario Papa I-20125 Milano / IT | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. CORRADINI & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | ||
Former [2006/06] | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.R.L. 4, Via Dante Alighieri 42100 Reggio Emilia (RE) / IT | Application number, filing date | 04730835.8 | 03.05.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004EP04691 | Priority number, date | IT2003MI00232U | 14.05.2003 Original published format: IT MI20030232 U | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004082418 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1622479 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A44C9/00 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
A44C9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RING MIT VERÄNDERBARER GESTALTUNG | [2006/06] | English: | RING OF VARIABLE CONFIGURATION | [2006/06] | French: | ANNEAU A CONFIGURATION VARIABLE | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 01.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/21] | 08.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5727399 (BERGAGNINI NORBERTO [US]) [X] 1-5,7 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 30; figures 1-3 * [Y] 6,8; | [XY]US6490886 (STEINHAUER DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 45; figures 3-5 * [Y] 6; | [XY]FR2581295 (CHRISTOFLE ORFEVRERIE [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,6 * page 1, line 37 - page 2, line 18; figures 1-6 * [Y] 8; | [X]FR2783404 (JM GAREL CREATION [FR]) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 12; figures 1-4 * |