EP1623494 - D.C. CONVERTER COMPRISING AN INPUT SWITCHING STEP AND SEVERAL OUTPUT CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINEBEA Co., Ltd. 4106-73, Oaza Miyota, Miyota-Machi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken / JP | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEGER, Robert, Dr. Bauordenstraße 44 4600 Wels / AT | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04730840.8 | 03.05.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004EP04681 | Priority number, date | DE2003121234 | 12.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10321234 | [2006/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004100346 | Date: | 18.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1623494 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1623494 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
H02M3/33561 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [2006/33] |
Former [2006/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEICHSPANNUNGSWANDLER MIT EINER EINGANGSSCHALTSTUFE UND MEHREREN AUSGANGSKANÄLEN | [2006/06] | English: | D.C. CONVERTER COMPRISING AN INPUT SWITCHING STEP AND SEVERAL OUTPUT CHANNELS | [2006/06] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR CONTINU-CONTINU COMPORTANT UN ETAGE DE COMMUTATION D'ENTREE ET PLUSIEURS CANAUX DE SORTIE | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 22.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.05.2008 | SE | 14.08.2008 | [2009/41] |
Former [2009/07] | SE | 14.08.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6369525 (CHANG CHIN [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [E]DE10260246 (MINEBEA CO LTD [JP]) [E] 3 * abstract * * paragraph [0042] ** figures 4,5 * |