EP1663563 - SPOT WELDING TONGS FOR ROBOTIC APPLICATIONS IN RESISTANCE WELDING OF WORKPIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fronius International GmbH Froniusstraße 1 4643 Pettenbach / AT | [2016/49] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Fronius International GmbH 4643 Pettenbach 319 / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STIEGLBAUER, Walter Wolfshütte 59 A-4901 Manning / AT | 02 /
WEIGERSTORFER, Günter Loibingdorf 12 A-4621 Sipbachzell / AT | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2006/23] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 04730943.0 | 04.05.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004AT00151 | Priority number, date | AT20030001023 | 03.07.2003 Original published format: AT 10232003 | [2006/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005002776 | Date: | 13.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1663563 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1663563 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23K11/30 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
B23K11/11 (EP,US);
B23K11/314 (EP,US);
B23K11/318 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/50] |
Former [2006/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PUNKTSCHWEISSZANGE FÜR ROBOTERANWENDUNGEN ZUM WIDERSTANDSSCHWEISSEN VON WERKSTÜCKEN | [2006/23] | English: | SPOT WELDING TONGS FOR ROBOTIC APPLICATIONS IN RESISTANCE WELDING OF WORKPIECES | [2006/23] | French: | PINCE A SOUDER POUR UTILISATIONS SUR ROBOTS, POUR LE SOUDAGE PAR RESISTANCE DE PIECES | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 28.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12159470.9 / EP2465633 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2004 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | ES | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | NL | 14.12.2016 | PL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | TR | 14.12.2016 | BG | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | AT | 04.05.2017 | IE | 04.05.2017 | LU | 04.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 04.05.2004 | |
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
AT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 04.05.2017 | ||
LU | 04.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.05.2004 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
AT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 04.05.2017 | ||
LU | 04.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
AT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 04.05.2017 | ||
LU | 04.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 04.05.2017 | ||
LU | 04.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 04.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB571401 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2; claims 1-7 *; | [X]US2678367 (KUNO EISENBURGER) [X] 11 * column 4, line 35 - column 4, line 65; figures 1,5; claims 3,5 *; | [A]GB1559068 (ELFIN SPA)[A] 11-17; | [X]US4684778 (CECIL DIMITRIOS G [US]) [X] 11 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 35; figures 1,2,7-9; claim 1 *; | [X]DE4416504 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 49 - column 3, line 63; figures 1-4; claims 1-6 *; | [DX]DE19754546 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [DX] 1-10 * figures 1,5; claims 1-7 * |