06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
23.03.2018 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
05.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
20.10.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
28.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
11.11.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
26.10.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.10.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.10.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.07.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.05.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2012 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] |
01.02.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.12.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.12.2011 |
First examination report |
|
19.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.09.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] |
25.05.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.05.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
05.05.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
14.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2006 |
Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.02.2006 |
Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
24.02.2006 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.02.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|