Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009266797 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004AT00151 | 04.05.2004 | US49979809 | 09.07.2009 | US56352804 | 04.05.2004 | AT10232003 | 03.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8178817 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2012 | B2 | US2006163212 | 27.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004AT00151 | 04.05.2004 | AT10232003 | 03.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4567677B | Global Dossier | 20.10.2010 | B2 | JP2007537873 | 27.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004AT00151 | 04.05.2004 | AT10232003 | 03.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2465633 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2016 | B1 | EP2465633 | 20.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT10232003 | 03.07.2003 | EP04730943 | 04.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1663563 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2016 | B1 | EP1663563 | 07.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004AT00151 | 04.05.2004 | AT10232003 | 03.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT500985B | 15.11.2006 | B1 | AT500985 | 15.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT18882004 | 12.11.2004 | AT10232003 | 03.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0412178 | 22.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004AT00151 | 04.05.2004 | AT10232003 | 03.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1816411B | 19.10.2011 | B | CN1816411 | 09.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004AT00151 | 04.05.2004 | AT10232003 | 03.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005002776 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT10232003 | 03.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT413664B | 15.04.2006 | B | ATA10232003 | 15.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | AT10232003 | 03.07.2003 | Type | Divisional application | EP2465633 |