EP1625173 - POLYAMIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINTERLING, Helmut Wittelsbachstr. 7 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
DEMETER, Jürgen Bruderweg 25 67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
DEININGER, Jürgen Robert-Koch-Str.48 68723 Oftersheim / DE | 04 /
KORY, Gad Bergstr. 11 69251 Gaiberg / DE | 05 /
SÖTJE, Oliver Freiheitsplatz 13 68199 Mannheim / DE | 06 /
WILMS, Axel Raiffeisenstrasse 25 67256 Weisenheim / DE | 07 /
WEISS, Robert Triftweg 25 67281 Kirchheim / DE | 08 /
KREMPEL, Kurt Amselweg 10 67127 Rödersheim-Gronau / DE | 09 /
BENISCH, Christoph Windmühlstr. 21 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2006/07] | Application number, filing date | 04731336.6 | 06.05.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004EP04817 | Priority number, date | DE2003121788 | 14.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10321788 | [2006/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004101648 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1625173 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1625173 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/02 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
C08G69/26 (EP,US);
C08G69/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08G69/08 (EP,US);
C08G69/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08G69/265 (EP,US);
C08G73/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYAMIDE | [2006/07] | English: | POLYAMIDES | [2006/07] | French: | POLYAMIDES | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 22.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.08.2007 | DK | 15.08.2007 | EE | 15.08.2007 | FI | 15.08.2007 | IE | 15.08.2007 | RO | 15.08.2007 | SI | 15.08.2007 | TR | 15.08.2007 | BG | 15.11.2007 | SE | 15.11.2007 | GR | 16.11.2007 | PT | 15.01.2008 | AT | 06.05.2008 | LU | 06.05.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/33] | CY | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
AT | 06.05.2008 | ||
LU | 06.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CY | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
AT | 06.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | DK | 15.08.2007 | |
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | DK | 15.08.2007 | |
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | DK | 15.08.2007 | |
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | DK | 15.08.2007 | |
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 15.08.2007 | |
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 15.08.2007 | |
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 15.08.2007 | |
BG | 15.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0083907 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-12 * page 1, paragraph 1 ** page 3, paragraph 2 *; | [XA]US5639819 (FARKAS NICHOLAS [CA], et al) [X] 1,8-12 * column 1, lines 40-54 * * example I * [A] 2-7; | [XA]US6094816 (DOSHI SHAILESH [CA]) [X] 1,8-12 * table 1 * [A] 2-7 |