EP1619361 - VALVE-MOVING DEVICE FOR ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2010/43] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Fujita, Hideo 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujita, Hideo Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 02 /
Hatamura, Koichi 20-16, Danharayamazaki-cho, Minami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 732-0813 / JP | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04731483.6 | 06.05.2004 | [2006/04] | WO2004JP06426 | Priority number, date | JP20030126257 | 01.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003126257 | JP20030304932 | 28.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003304932 | [2006/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004097185 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1619361 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/04] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1619361 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1619361 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F01L13/00 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
F01L1/08 (EP,US);
F01L1/185 (EP,US);
F01L13/0063 (EP,US);
F01L2305/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTILBEWEGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR MOTOR | [2006/04] | English: | VALVE-MOVING DEVICE FOR ENGINE | [2006/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DEPLACEMENT DE SOUPAPE POUR MOTEUR | [2006/04] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2005 | Translation filed | 02.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.10.2010 | BE | 27.10.2010 | CY | 27.10.2010 | CZ | 27.10.2010 | DK | 27.10.2010 | EE | 27.10.2010 | FI | 27.10.2010 | HU | 27.10.2010 | NL | 27.10.2010 | PL | 27.10.2010 | RO | 27.10.2010 | SE | 27.10.2010 | SI | 27.10.2010 | SK | 27.10.2010 | TR | 27.10.2010 | BG | 27.01.2011 | GR | 28.01.2011 | ES | 07.02.2011 | PT | 28.02.2011 | IE | 06.05.2011 | LU | 06.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CY | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
TR | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
IE | 06.05.2011 | ||
LU | 06.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CY | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
IE | 06.05.2011 | ||
LU | 06.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
IE | 06.05.2011 | ||
LU | 06.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
IE | 06.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 27.10.2010 | |
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4326331 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [A]EP0780547 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]EP1039103 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]WO0129466 (VEE TWO PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]DE19960742 (IAV GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]EP1111205 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]EP1143118 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]EP1255027 (STS SYSTEM TECHNOLOGY SERVICES [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]DE10123186 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH0617626 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [X]JPH06307219 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JPH0763023 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG); | [A]JPH07293216 (MITSUBISHI AUTO ENG, et al) |