EP1627347 - RF RECEPTION SYSTEM AND PORTABLE OBJECT THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axalto S.A. 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Malco, Inc. 9800 Reistertown Owings Mills, MD 21117 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states Axalto SA 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Malco, Inc. 9800 Reistertown Owings Mills, MD 21117 / US | |||
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states Axalto SA 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Malco, Inc. 9800 Reistertown Owings Mills, MD 21117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEROY, Pascal 2 rue de Cinqueix F-60870 Rieux / FR | 02 /
ROUSSEL, François 9 chemin du Ru d'Aulnay F-92330 Sceaux / FR | 03 /
LEIBENGUTH, Joseph 72 rue Royale F-92210 Saint-Cloud / FR | [2006/08] | Representative(s) | Cour, Pierre, et al Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92197 Meudon Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Cour, Pierre, et al Axalto SA IP & Licensing Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92197 Meudon Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/08] | Cour, Pierre Axalto SA, 50, avenue Jean-Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | Application number, filing date | 04731697.1 | 07.05.2004 | [2006/08] | WO2004IB01780 | Priority number, date | EP20030291093 | 07.05.2003 Original published format: EP 03291093 | EP20030292982 | 28.11.2003 Original published format: EP 03292982 | EP20030293001 | 01.12.2003 Original published format: EP 03293001 | [2006/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004100060 | Date: | 18.11.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1627347 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07, H04H1/00, H04N7/03, H04Q7/22, H03J5/00, H04B1/16 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
H04W88/02 (EP);
H04H40/18 (EP);
H04H60/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RADIOFREQUENZ-EMPFÄNGER-SYSTEM UND ZUGEHÖRIGER TRAGBARER GEGENSTAND | [2006/08] | English: | RF RECEPTION SYSTEM AND PORTABLE OBJECT THEREFOR | [2006/08] | French: | SYSTEME DE RECEPTION RADIOFREQUENCE ET OBJET PORTABLE ASSOCIE | [2006/08] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 11.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/34] | 28.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.2006 | 31.05.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE29607115U (HAUPT ROLF WILHELM) [X] 1,2,7,9 * the whole document *; | [X]US4857840 (LANCHAIS MICHEL) [X] 1,6,8,10 * column 1, line 63 - column 7, line 32 * * column 8, line 45 - column 9, line 15 *; | [X]WO03001772 (LORD FRANK ; PAPERLESS INTERACTIVE NEWSPAPE (US)) [X] 1-5,7 * page 2, line 34 - page 14, line 34 *; | [X]US5473609 (CHANEY JOHN W) [X] 1,3,4,7,9 * column 2, line 23 - column 2, line 42 * * column 4, line 45 - line 65 * * column 6, line 45 - column 11, line 44; figures 3,4 *; | [X]JPH0264768 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP9064768 A 19970307 (HITACHI LTD; HITACHI MEDIA ELECTRON:KK) [X] 1,10 * abstract * |