EP1624022 - LIQUID RESIN COMPOSITION, CURED FILM AND LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JSR Corporation 5-6-10, Tsukiji, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8410 / JP | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANABE, Takayoshi c/o JSR CORPORATION, 5-6-10, Tsukiji Chuo-ku, Tokyo 1048410 / JP | 02 /
ERIYAMA, Yuichi c/o JSR CORPORATION, 5-6-10, Tsukiji Chuo-ku, Tokyo 1048410 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMURA, Tetsuya c/o JSR CORPORATION, 5-6-10, Tsukiji Chuo-ku, Tokyo 1048410 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Yasunobu c/o JSR CORPORATION, 5-6-10, Tsukiji Chuo-ku, Tokyo 1048410 / JP | 05 /
SHIMOMURA, Hiroomi c/o JSR CORPORATION, 5-6-10, Tsukiji Chuo-ku, Tokyo 1048410 / JP | 06 /
DOIMOTO, Mitsunobu c/o JSR CORPORATION, 5-6-10, Tsukiji Chuo-ku, Tokyo 1048410 / JP | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04731771.4 | 07.05.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004JP06508 | Priority number, date | JP20030136848 | 15.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003136848 | JP20030424975 | 22.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003424975 | [2006/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004101676 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1624022 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08L27/12, C08K3/22, B32B27/30, G02B1/10, G02B1/11 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
B32B27/18 (EP,US);
C08L27/12 (KR);
B32B23/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/26 (EP,US);
B32B27/28 (EP,US);
B32B27/322 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,KR,US);
G02B1/105 (EP);
G02B1/111 (EP,US);
G02B1/14 (EP,US);
G02B1/16 (EP,US);
B32B2250/24 (EP,US);
B32B2264/102 (EP,US);
B32B2307/408 (EP,US);
B32B2307/418 (EP,US);
B32B2457/20 (EP,US);
B32B2551/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L27/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/34] |
Former [2006/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, GEHÄRTETE FOLIE UND LAMINAT | [2006/06] | English: | LIQUID RESIN COMPOSITION, CURED FILM AND LAMINATE | [2006/06] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINE LIQUIDE, FILM DURCI ET STRATIFIE | [2006/06] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2005 | Translation filed | 10.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 10.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/28] | 26.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1170333 (NEXPRESS SOLUTIONS LLC [US]) [A] 1-14 * examples 1-3 *; | [X]EP1178367 (NEXPRESS SOLUTIONS LLC [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0043]; claim - *; | [A]WO02084338 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* page 22, lines 10-18; claim - *; | [DA]JP2002372601 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [DA] 1-14 * example 2; table 4 * | International search | [XP]WO03082936 (JSR CORP [JP]); | [X]JP2002372601 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]JP2002285069 (NIPPON YUSHI BASF COATINGS KK); | [Y]JP2000171603 (TOMOEGAWA PAPER CO LTD); | [A]JP2002082207 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]JP2000186216 (JSR CORP) |