EP1628912 - USE OF PULVERULENT MIXTURES CONTAINING HYDROGEN PEROXIDE AND HYDROPHOBED SILICON DIOXIDE FOR THE CONTROLLED RELEASE OF HYDROGEN PEROXIDE OR OXYGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALZER, Egon Am Bornberg 9 63477 Maintal / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Corinna Schöne Aussicht 36396 Steinau / DE | 03 /
BRANDNER, Friedhelm Seeweg 56b 63906 Erlenbach / DE | 04 /
HASENZAHL, Steffen 109 Glenbrook Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 05 /
SCHOLZ, Mario Weinbergstrasse 35 63584 Gründau / DE | 06 /
DEL GROSSO, Birgit Waldstrasse 23 63579 Freigericht / DE | [2006/09] | Application number, filing date | 04731928.0 | 10.05.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004EP04954 | Priority number, date | DE20031023840 | 23.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10323840 | DE20041002356 | 15.01.2004 Original published format: DE102004002356 | [2006/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004103508 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1628912 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C01B15/14, C01B13/02, A61K33/40, A61L15/18 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
A61K33/40 (EP,US);
A61K8/022 (EP,US);
A61K8/11 (EP,US);
A61K8/22 (EP,US);
A61K8/25 (EP,US);
A61K8/585 (EP,US);
A61L15/18 (EP,US);
A61L15/46 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q5/08 (EP,US);
A61Q5/10 (EP,US);
C01B13/0211 (EP,US);
C01B15/01 (EP,US);
C01B15/14 (EP,US);
C11D3/124 (EP,US);
C11D3/3942 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US);
A61L2300/11 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON PULVERF RMIGEN MISCHUNGEN, ENTHALTEND WASSERS TOFFPEROXID UND HYDROPHOBIERTES SILICIUMDIOXID ZUR KONTROLLIERTEN FREISETZUNG VON WASSERSTOFFPEROXID ODER SAUERSTOFF | [2006/09] | English: | USE OF PULVERULENT MIXTURES CONTAINING HYDROGEN PEROXIDE AND HYDROPHOBED SILICON DIOXIDE FOR THE CONTROLLED RELEASE OF HYDROGEN PEROXIDE OR OXYGEN | [2006/09] | French: | UTILISATION DE MELANGES PULVERULENTS CONTENANT DU PEROXYDE D'HYDROGENE ET DU DIOXYDE DE SILICIUM RENDU HYDROPHOBE POUR LA LIBERATION CONTROLEE DE PEROXYDE D'HYDROGENE OU D'OXYGENE | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 19.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/22] | 09.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE962251 (DEGUSSA) [Y] 6-13 * page 2, line 59 - line 66; claim - *; | [XY]DE2013763 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 4, line 2; claim - * [Y] 3,6-14; | [Y]US3830738 (COTTRELL A) [Y] 3 * column 2, line 11 - line 25 *; | [Y]EP0367934 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [Y] 6-14 * page 3, line 30 - line 54; claim - *; | [Y]US5674436 (BREITENBACH JOERG [DE], et al) [Y] 14 * claim - *; | [Y]US5785934 (JACOBS PAUL TAYLOR [US], et al) [Y] 10-13 * claim - *; | [A]WO0180645 (SOREX LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * claim - *; | [Y]WO02056844 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 3; | [PX]US2003160209 (HOFFMAN DENNIS M [US], et al) [PX] 1* paragraphs [0019] , [0020]; claim - *; | [PY]EP1386599 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]) [PY] 3 * paragraph [0007]; claim - * |