EP1622707 - DEVICE FOR DOSING AND MIXING POWDERY MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/06] | DEVICE FOR DOSING AND MIXING POWDERY MATERIALS AND DEVICE FOR DOSING POWDERY MATERIALS | ||
[2008/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steinwald, Kurt Mühlweg 102/11 3100 St. Pölten / AT | [2006/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 04732070.0 | 11.05.2004 | [2006/06] | WO2004AT00165 | Priority number, date | AT20030000722 | 12.05.2003 Original published format: AT 7222003 | AT20040000486 | 19.03.2004 Original published format: AT 4862004 | [2006/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004098763 | Date: | 18.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1622707 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1622707 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01F13/10, B01F15/02, G01G19/22, G01F22/00, B01F15/00, B65B1/32, B65B7/00 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
G01G19/22 (EP,US);
B01F33/805 (EP,US);
B01F33/85 (EP,US);
B01F35/20 (EP,US);
B01F35/2211 (EP,US);
B01F35/714 (EP,US);
B01F35/71731 (EP,US);
B01F35/75455 (EP,US);
B29B7/242 (EP);
B29B7/244 (EP);
B29B7/603 (EP);
B29B7/748 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/06] | B01F13/10, B01F15/02, G01G19/22, G01F22/00, B01F15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM DOSIEREN UND MISCHEN PULVERFÖRMIGER MATERIALIEN | [2006/06] | English: | DEVICE FOR DOSING AND MIXING POWDERY MATERIALS | [2008/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR DOSER ET MELANGER DE MATIERES PULVERULENTES | [2008/15] |
Former [2006/06] | DEVICE FOR DOSING AND MIXING POWDERY MATERIALS AND DEVICE FOR DOSING POWDERY MATERIALS | ||
Former [2006/06] | DISPOSITIF POUR DOSER ET MELANGER DES MATIERES PULVERULENTES ET DISPOSITIF POUR DOSER DES MATIERES PULVERULENTES | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 23.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.09.2008 | CZ | 03.09.2008 | DK | 03.09.2008 | EE | 03.09.2008 | FI | 03.09.2008 | IE | 03.09.2008 | NL | 03.09.2008 | PL | 03.09.2008 | RO | 03.09.2008 | SI | 03.09.2008 | SK | 03.09.2008 | TR | 03.09.2008 | BG | 03.12.2008 | SE | 03.12.2008 | GR | 04.12.2008 | PT | 03.02.2009 | HU | 04.03.2009 | LU | 11.05.2009 | BE | 31.05.2009 | CH | 31.05.2009 | LI | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
HU | 04.03.2009 | ||
LU | 11.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
LU | 11.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | FI | 03.09.2008 | |
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 03.09.2008 | |
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 03.09.2008 | |
NL | 03.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH01137963 ; | [A]CH330809 (NAUTA VAN SCHMID CLARA WILHELM [NL], et al) [A] 1-4,18-24,28,31-34,36-41,43,45 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE1573126 (APPLIC ENG CORP) [A] 1-4,18-24,28,31-34,36-41,43,45 * figures 1-7; claims 1-6 *; | [A]DE2131600 (BLASE MUEHLEN U MASCHINENBAU A) [A] 1-4,18-24,28,31-34,36-41,43,45 * page 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 6 * * page 3, paragraph 3 ** figures 1,2; claims 1-5 *; | [X]DE3036968 (MEYER MASCHINEN UND WIEGEAPPAR [DE]) [X] 1-4,18-24,28,31-34,36-41,43,45 * page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraphs 5,6 * * page 24, paragraph 2 - page 25, paragraph 2 * * figures 1,6,22-25 *; | [A]EP0170322 (NAT FORGE EUROP [BE]) [A] 1-4,18-24,28,31-34,36-41,43,45 * figure 1; claims 1-12 * * abstract *; | [X]EP0499573 (SKAKO AS [DK]) [X] 1-4,18-24,28,31-34,36-41,43,45 * column 5, line 24 - column 7, line 5 * * figures 2,3,6; claims 1-7 * * abstract *; | [X]US5527107 (WEIBEL ROMAN [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,18-24,28,31-34,36-41,43,45 * column 5, line 22 - column 8, line 41 * * figures 1-7; claims 1-5 * * abstract *; | [X]US5627346 (WEIBEL ROMAN [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,18-24,28,31-34,36-41,43,45 * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 51 * * figures 1-7; claims 1-3 * * abstract *; | [DX]DE19728624 (PFISTER SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-4,18-24,28,31-34,36-41,43,45 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 68 * * figure 1; claims 1-11 * * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890828), vol. 013, no. 388, Database accession no. (C - 630), & JP01137963 A 19890530 (NIPPON HAIGOU SHIRYO KK; others: 01) [A] 1-4,18-24,28,31-34,36-41,43,45 * abstract * |