30.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
23.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
08.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
22.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
12.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] |
11.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] |
14.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] |
05.02.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
29.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
25.12.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] |
31.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
24.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
10.07.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
22.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] |
08.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] |
01.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
20.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] |
06.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] |
13.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] |
01.08.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
31.07.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.07.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.07.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.07.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.07.2008 |
Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.03.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.03.2008 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] |
07.03.2008 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] |
07.03.2008 |
Change - English title |
published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] |
06.09.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.07.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2007 |
First examination report |
|
01.03.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.08.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.07.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] |
23.06.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.05.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.02.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.12.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] |
23.12.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] |
01.12.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|