EP1746988 - SPIRODERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF HYPERTENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Darley Pharmaceuticals Ltd. 7 Ha'eshel St. P.O. Box 3063 Caesarea Industrial Park 38900 / IL | [2007/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAMIR, Nadav 14/25 Laskov Street, Kiryat Ben-Gurion 58672 Holon / IL | [2007/05] | Representative(s) | Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/05] | Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04732165.8 | 11.05.2004 | [2007/05] | WO2004IL00396 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005107739 | Date: | 17.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1746988 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/35, A61K31/34, A61K31/381, A61K31/382, A61K31/38 | [2007/05] | CPC: |
A61K31/34 (EP);
A61K31/35 (EP);
A61K31/38 (EP);
A61K31/381 (EP);
A61K31/382 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIRODERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BLUTHOCHDRUCK | [2007/05] | English: | SPIRODERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF HYPERTENSION | [2007/05] | French: | SPIRODERIVES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERTENSION | [2007/05] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/05] | 27.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/13] | 17.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]JP2004210648 ; | [XY]US4129659 (PRESSMAN BERTON C ET AL) [X] 1-4,6-10,12-16,20-24 * column 1, line 10 - line 37 * * column 2, line 20 - line 56 * [Y] 1-25; | [XY]WO0139766 (ZAMIR NADAR ; LAVIE YAAKOV (IL); ALYDAR PHARMACEUTICALS LTD (IL); ALYD) [X] 20-25 * page 58; table 5a * * claims 1,15,22,26,28 * [Y] 1-25; | [X]US3629287 (AARON JOSEPH E ET AL) [X] 20-24 * column 6; example 1 * * examples 2-5; table 1 * * column 10; example IV *; | [Y]US4824959 (HAN WILLIAM T ET AL) [Y] 1-25 * column 24; examples 10-12 *; | [Y]US3651090 (AARON JOSEPH E ET AL) [Y] 1-25 * column 1, line 15 - line 26 *; | [Y]US3547951 (AARON JOSEPH E ET AL) [Y] 1-25 * column 13, line 35 - column 14, line 34 *; | [Y]EP0686625 (EISAI CO LTD) [Y] 1-25 * claims 1,8 * * abstract * | [E] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 55, Database accession no. 2004-565139, XP002302282 & JP2004210648 A 20040729 (SUMITOMO SEIYAKU KK) [E] 20-24 * abstract * |