EP1626614 - METHOD FOR FORMING FINE COPPER PARTICLE SINTERED PRODUCT TYPE OF ELECTRIC CONDUCTOR HAVING FINE SHAPE, METHOD FOR FORMING FINE COPPER WIRING AND THIN COPPER FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/07] | METHOD FOR FORMING FINE COPPER PARTICLE SINTERED PRODUCT TYPE OF ELECTRIC CONDUCTOR HAVING FINE SHAPE, METHOD FOR FORMING FINE COPPER WIRING AND THIN COPPER FILM USING SAID METHOD | ||
[2012/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARIMA CHEMICALS, INC. 671-4, Mizuashi, Noguchi-cho Kakogawa-shi Hyogo-ken 657-0019 / JP | [2013/35] |
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states HARIMA CHEMICALS, INC. 671-4, Mizuashi, Noguchi-cho Kakogawa-shi Hyogo-ken 657-0019 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOH, Daisuke, c/o Tsukuba Research Laboratory Harima Chemicals, Inc. 9-3, Tokodai 5-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3002635 / JP | 02 /
IZUMITANI, Akihito, c/o Tsukuba Research Laboratory Harima Chemicals, Inc. 9-3, Tokodai 5-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3002635 / JP | 03 /
HATA, Noriaki, c/o Tsukuba Research Laboratory Harima Chemicals, Inc. 9-3, Tokodai 5-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3002635 / JP | 04 /
MATSUBA, Yorishige, c/o Tsukuba Research Laboratory Harima Chemicals, Inc. 9-3, Tokodai 5-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3002635 / JP | [2013/34] |
Former [2006/07] | 01 /
ITOH, Daisuke, c/o Harima Chemicals, Inc. 9-3, Tokodai 5-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3002635 / JP | ||
02 /
IZUMITANI, Akihito, c/o Harima Chemicals, Inc. 9-3, Tokodai 5-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3002635 / JP | |||
03 /
HATA, Noriaki, c/o Harima Chemicals, Inc. 9-3, Tokodai 5-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3002635 / JP | |||
04 /
MATSUBA, Yorishige, c/o Harima Chemicals, Inc. 9-3, Tokodai 5-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3002635 / JP | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/40] | Murray, Adrian D'Coligny W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/07] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04732751.5 | 13.05.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004JP06442 | Priority number, date | JP20030139398 | 16.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003139398 | JP20030292283 | 12.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003292283 | [2006/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004103043 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1626614 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1626614 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/10, H05K3/12, H01B1/22 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
H05K3/1283 (EP,US);
H05K3/10 (KR);
H01B1/22 (EP,KR,US);
H05K3/102 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (KR);
H05K2201/0257 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0315 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1131 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1157 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/07] | H05K3/10, H01L21/288 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/34] |
Former [2006/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN LEITERS DES FEINKUPFERPARTIKELSINTERPRODUKTTYPS MIT FEINER FORM, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FEINKUPFERVERDRAHTUNG UND EINES DÜNNEN KUPFERFILMS | [2012/39] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING FINE COPPER PARTICLE SINTERED PRODUCT TYPE OF ELECTRIC CONDUCTOR HAVING FINE SHAPE, METHOD FOR FORMING FINE COPPER WIRING AND THIN COPPER FILM | [2012/39] | French: | PROCEDE DE FORMATION DE PRODUIT FRITTE A BASE DE FINES PARTICULES DE CUIVRE DU TYPE CONDUCTEUR ELECTRIQUE FIN, PROCEDE DE FORMATION DE CABLAGE EN CUIVRE FIN ET DE COUCHE DE CUIVRE MINCE | [2012/39] |
Former [2006/07] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN LEITERS DES FEINKUPFERPARTIKELSINTERPRODUKTTYPS MIT FEINER FORM, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FEINKUPFERVERDRAHTUNG UND EINES DÜNNKUPFERFILMS MIT DEM VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2006/07] | METHOD FOR FORMING FINE COPPER PARTICLE SINTERED PRODUCT TYPE OF ELECTRIC CONDUCTOR HAVING FINE SHAPE, METHOD FOR FORMING FINE COPPER WIRING AND THIN COPPER FILM USING SAID METHOD | ||
Former [2006/07] | PROCEDE DE FORMATION DE PRODUIT FRITTE A BASE DE FINES PARTICULES DE CUIVRE DU TYPE CONDUCTEUR ELECTRIQUE FIN, PROCEDE DE FORMATION DE CABLAGE EN CUIVRE FIN ET DE COUCHE DE CUIVRE MINCE FAISANT APPEL AUDIT PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2005 | Translation filed | 15.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 05.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2012 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 09.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2012 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 05.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5035837 (SAEKI SHUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-29 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 65 *; | [PX]WO03051562 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [PX] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [E]US2005069648 (MARUYAMA MUTSUHIRO [JP]) [E] 1-29* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH10294018 (ULVAC CORP); | [A]JPH06224538 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [A]JPH0457389 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) | Examination | US6366333 | by applicant | US5035837 | WO03051562 | US6366333 |