EP1629883 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING INORGANIC SPHERE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2006/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUBARA, Toshiya, c/o Asahi Glass Company, Ltd. 10, Goikaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 2908566 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Masaharu 2-4-2-801,Hagiwara,Yahatanashi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 8040061 / JP | 03 /
KATAYAMA, Hajime, c/o Asahi Glass Company, Ltd. 10, Goikaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 2908566 / JP | 04 /
YAMADA, Kenji, c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2218755 / JP | [2007/18] |
Former [2006/09] | 01 /
MATSUBARA, Toshiya, c/o Asahi Glass Company, Ltd. 10, Goikaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 2908566 / JP | ||
02 /
TANAKA, Masaharu 8-14-708, Nakahonmachi, Tobata-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 8040061 / JP | |||
03 /
KATAYAMA, Hajime, c/o Asahi Glass Company, Ltd. 10, Goikaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 2908566 / JP | |||
04 /
YAMADA, Kenji, c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2218755 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04732812.5 | 13.05.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004JP06810 | Priority number, date | JP20030133992 | 13.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003133992 | [2006/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004101139 | Date: | 25.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1629883 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1629883 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, C01B33/193, B01J13/02, B01J13/04 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
B01J13/02 (EP,US);
B01J19/00 (KR);
B01F23/4105 (EP,US);
B01F25/3142 (EP,US);
B01J13/04 (EP,US);
B01J2/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/09] | B01J19/00, C01B33/193 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/33] |
Former [2006/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ANORGANISCHEN KUGELN | [2006/09] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING INORGANIC SPHERE | [2006/09] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UNE SPHERE INORGANIQUE | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2005 | Translation filed | 20.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 29.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0528201 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD [JP], et al) [XY] 1-7 * claims 1,3,5 * * figure 1 * * example 1 * * column 7, line 28 - line 31 * * column 7, line 55 - line 58 * * column 8, line 1 - line 11 ** column 9, line 6 - line 9 *; | [PXY]EP1382384 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [PXY] 1-7 * claims 2,3,10 * * page 4, line 17; figure 5 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * page 9, line 54 - line 55 * * page 10, line 42 - line 45 * * page 11, line 3 - line 5 * * page 11, line 23 - line 25 * * page 11, line 42 - line 45 * | International search | [Y]JPH04154605 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN, et al); | [Y]JPS59112830 (IIZUKA HIROYOSHI, et al); | [Y]JP2002119841 (NAT FOOD RES, et al); | [A]JPH0775728 (SUZUKI YUSHI KOGYO KK, et al) |